Manning v. Payne et al
Plaintiff: Travis Manning
Defendant: Dexter Payne, Angela Jenkins, Paul Walter, Wanda Brown Brooks, Joseph Efird, Joseph Thomas, M Hurst, Marshall Dale Reed, Does, Fidel Cobb, William McNairy, Morieon Kelly, Jeremy Andrews, Roosevelt Barden, James Dycus and Emily Branch
Case Number: 4:2019cv00854
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Patricia S Harris
Referring Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying #19 Motion for Reconsideration. Manning has been ordered to file an amended complaint. If after screening the amended complaint, the Court determines that service is appropriate and there are problems serving the defendants, the Court may extend the time for service under Fed. R. Civil P. 4(m). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 1/29/2020.(dml)
January 28, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Reconsideration re 13 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, by Travis Manning. (kdr)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that Manning file an amended complaint conforming to this order within 30 days; and directing the Clerk of Court to send Manning a blank 1983 form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 1/23/2020. (ljb)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Status. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff Manning a copy of Doc. No. #15 , as well as a copy of the docket sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 1/13/2020. (cfd)
January 13, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Status by Travis Manning. (llg)
January 9, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Travis Manning. (llg)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend as Moot. This motion appears to be a duplicate of Doc. No. 7, which has been granted. See Doc. No. 9. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 1/2/2020.(dml)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying #11 Motion to Appoint Counsel. This motion appears to be a duplicate of Doc. No. 8 which has been denied. See Doc. No. 10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 1/2/2020.(dml)
January 3, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #11 Motion. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the filing event as "MOTION to Appoint Counsel" as marked on the document. (jak)
January 3, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #2 Complaint by Travis Manning. (llg)
January 3, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Travis Manning. (llg) (Docket text modified on 1/3/2020 to correct the filing event) (jak)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying #8 Motion to Appoint Counsel. A civil litigant does not have a constitutional or statutory right to appointed counsel in a civil action but the Court may appoint counsel at its discretion. 28 U.S.C. s. 1915(e)(1). The Court has considered plaintiff's need for an attorney, the likelihood that plaintiff will benefit from assistance of counsel, the factual complexity of the case, the plaintiff's ability to investigate and present his case, and the complexity of the legal issues. In considering these factors, the Court finds that plaintiff's claims do not appear legally or factually complex, and it appears he is capable of prosecuting his claims without appointed counsel at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 12/30/2019.(dml)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Extend Time. Plaintiff may have an additional 30 days to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff should file his complaint on or before February 1, 2020, or his complaint may be dismissed. Plaintiff should not need to conduct legal research to set forth the factual basis for his complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 12/30/2019. (dml)
December 30, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Travis Manning. (ljb)
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Extend Time by Travis Manning. (ljb)
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE to the Court by Travis Manning. (ljb)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER PLAINTIFFS granting #1 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's institutional account for the $350 filing fee; directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the East Arkansas Regional Unit, the ADC Trust Fund Centralization Bank Office, and the ADC Compliance Office; directing Manning to amend his complaint within 30 days from the date of this Order; and directing the Clerk of Court to send a blank 1983 complaint form to Manning. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 12/3/2019. (ljb)
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 BRIEF and MEMORANDUM of Law In Support of #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Travis Manning. (llg)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Travis Manning. (llg)
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Travis Manning. (llg)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Travis Manning. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manning v. Payne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanda Brown Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Efird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Dale Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidel Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William McNairy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morieon Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roosevelt Barden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dycus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?