White v. C R Bard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Sheri White
Defendant: C R Bard Inc, Does 1 through 100, inclusive and Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00864
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Referring Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Hiba Kazim on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Kazim, Hiba)
December 30, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Talley, Graham)
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc.(Talley, Graham)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 motion to admit counsel pro hac vice. Robert W. Boatman is hereby admitted to appear before this Court as co-counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 12/30/2019. (ljb)
December 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Robert W. Boatman. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3595302. Filed by Sheri White. (cmn)
December 12, 2019 Filing 4 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to #3 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge James M. Moody Jr. (jak)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign this case to Judge Moody. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/12/2019. (jak)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Sheri White. Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc served on 12/10/2019; C R Bard Inc served on 12/10/2019. (Scott, Charles)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Sheri White. (Fee $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT075100.) Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. C R Bard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Inc
Represented By: Hiba Kazim
Represented By: Graham Caughman Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc
Represented By: Hiba Kazim
Represented By: Graham Caughman Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheri White
Represented By: Robert W. Boatman
Represented By: Charles E. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?