Tipton v. Conn Appliances Inc
Plaintiff: Stacy Tipton
Defendant: Conn Appliances Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00877
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:521
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #10 and #11 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael A. Harvey and Christopher M. Jordan are admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/27/20. (mmb)
January 27, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Christopher M. Jordan. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3624433. Filed by Conn Appliances Inc (Wisley, P.)
January 27, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Michael A. Harvey. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3624428. Filed by Conn Appliances Inc (Wisley, P.)
January 20, 2020 Filing 9 Defendant Conn Appliances, Inc's Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Conn Appliances Inc.(Wisley, P.)
January 7, 2020 Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 3/16/2020. Rule 26(f) Report due by 3/30/2020. Jury Trial set for 1/12/2021 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 1/7/20. (mmb)
January 6, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATED CLERK'S ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANT'S DEADLINE TO PLEAD TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 1/6/2020. (jak)
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by P. Joshua Wisley on behalf of Conn Appliances Inc (Wisley, P.)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. CORRECTION: The original affidavit was submitted with docket entry #3 in error (incompatible image file). The correct document was added to docket entry #3 based on the attached correspondence. (jak)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Accordingly, Jason Derry is admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/2/20. (mmb)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Jason R. Derry. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3605748. Filed by Stacy Tipton (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jason Derry)(Sanford, Joshua) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/2/2020: #2 Affidavit - Correct (submitted 1/2/2020)) (jak).
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stacy Tipton. Conn Appliances Inc served on 12/16/2019. (Sanford, Joshua)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Conn Appliances Inc filed by Stacy Tipton (Fee $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT075137.) Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tipton v. Conn Appliances Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conn Appliances Inc
Represented By: Michael A. Harvey
Represented By: Christopher M. Jordan
Represented By: P. Joshua Wisley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Tipton
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Represented By: Jason R. Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?