Foster v. Welcare Health Plans
Plaintiff: Gural Foster
Defendant: Welcare Health Plans
Case Number: 4:2019cv00896
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Filing 9 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Gural Foster re #3 Order denying Motion to proceed in forma pauperis, #5 Order directing Foster to update his address with the Clerk of Court. (fjg)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #7 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Foster's first monthly payment of $100 is due by 2/24/2020. Foster must also file an amended complaint by 2/24/2020 which clarifies the jurisdictional facts, No. #3 . Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/3/2020. (jak)
January 31, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Gural Foster. (cmn)
January 22, 2020 Filing 6 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Gural Foster re #5 Order. (fjg)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing Foster to update his address with the Clerk of Court by 2/18/2020. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/17/2020. (jak)
December 24, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Gural Foster re #3 Order. (jbh)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis with instructions. The first $100 payment is due by 1/15/2020. If no payment is made by then, the Court will dismiss his complaint without prejudice. Foster must also file an amended complaint by 1/15/2020 which clarifies the jurisdictional facts. If he does not, the Court will dismiss his complaint without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/19/2019. (jak)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Welcare Health Plans filed by Gural Foster.(ajt)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gural Foster. (ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster v. Welcare Health Plans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gural Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welcare Health Plans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?