Biddle v. Homes at Granite Mountain et al
Plaintiff: Angela Renee Biddle
Defendant: Homes at Granite Mountain, Housing Authority of the City of Little Rock, Ledic Management Group LLC and Housing Authority of the City of Little Rock doing business as Metropolitan Housing Alliance
Case Number: 4:2019cv00901
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Summons Issued as to Homes at Granite Mountain, Housing Authority of the City of Little Rock, Ledic Management Group LLC. And forward to Plaintiff for service. (ajt)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis; and instructing the Clerk to prepare and issue summonses for the Defendants. Plaintiff must execute service on or before 04/08/2020, which is 90 days from the issuance of this Order. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 01/09/2020. (ajt)
December 16, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Angela Renee Biddle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Angela Renee Biddle. (ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Biddle v. Homes at Granite Mountain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homes at Granite Mountain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Housing Authority of the City of Little Rock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ledic Management Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Housing Authority of the City of Little Rock doing business as Metropolitan Housing Alliance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Renee Biddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?