Dodds v. East et al
Plaintiff: Beverly Dodds
Defendant: Marquis East, Feletia Wilke, Demetrius Swift, Jimmy Miller, Mike Hunt, Kendall and Tyson Food
Case Number: 4:2019cv00939
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2020 Summons Issued as to Marquis East, Mike Hunt, Kendall, Jimmy Miller, Demetrius Swift, Feletia Wilke. And forwarded to the USMS for service. (ajt)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare Summons for each of the defendants in Plaintiff's Amended Complaint: (1) Marquis East, General Plant Manager; (2) Mike Hunt, Plant Superintendent; (3) Feletia Wilke, Human Resources; (4) Kendall, Human Resources Assistant; (5) Jimmy Miller, Floor Supervisor; (6) Demetrius Swift, Plant Chaplin, and (7) Tyson Foods; directing the United States Marshal to serve a copy of #7 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and a Summons- via certified mail with a return receipt requested and delivery restricted- to each respective Defendant; directing the Plaintiff to provide the Court with a valid address for service on Tyson Foods within 30 days of this Order; and denying without prejudice #3 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 02/24/2020. (ajt)
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against all Defendants, filed by Beverly Dodds (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet with attachments) (jap)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; and directing Plaintiff, within 30 days of this Order, to file an Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 01/10/2020. (ajt)
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Beverly Dodds re #2 Complaint (jap)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER provisionally granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, pursuant to General Order No. 29. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 12/30/2019. (ajt)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Beverly Dodds. (ajt)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Beverly Dodds. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Beverly Dodds. (ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dodds v. East et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquis East
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Feletia Wilke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demetrius Swift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Food
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Dodds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?