McAlister v. US Pizza Company Inc
Plaintiff: Lauren McAlister
Defendant: US Pizza Company Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv00158
Filed: February 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Settlement (JOINT) by US Pizza Company Inc (Kim, Jane)
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 5/26/2020. Rule 26(f) Report due by 6/8/2020. Bench Trial set for 3/16/2021 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 3/16/20. (mmb)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 Complaint /Defendant U.S. Pizza Company, Inc.'s Answer to Original Complaint by US Pizza Company Inc.(Kim, Jane)
February 18, 2020 Filing 1 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT against US Pizza Company Inc, filed by Lauren McAlister. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT076086.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McAlister v. US Pizza Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Pizza Company Inc
Represented By: Jane A. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren McAlister
Represented By: April Rheaume
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?