Stevens et al v. Boy Scouts of America et al
Plaintiff: James Allen, William Stevens and Lavell Campbell
Defendant: Boy Scouts of America and Quapaw Area Council Incorporated of the Boy Scouts of America
Case Number: 4:2020cv00159
Filed: February 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE by Boy Scouts of America Notice of Entry of Consent Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Consent Order)(Miller, Stuart)
March 23, 2020 Filing 44 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Stephen F. Crew re #29 Order, #30 Order, #31 Protective Order. (jbh)
March 17, 2020 Filing 43 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Peter B Janci re Notice of Docket Correction re #40 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (fjg)
March 17, 2020 Filing 42 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Stephen F. Crew re Notice of Docket Correction re #40 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (fjg)
March 9, 2020 Filing 41 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Stephen F. Crew re #32 Notice of Docket Correction, #33 Notice of Docket Correction, #34 Notice of Docket Correction, #35 Notice of Docket Correction. (fjg)
March 4, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #40 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description to "Notice", pursuant to instruction from chambers. (kbc)
March 3, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE by Boy Scouts of America (Miller, Stuart) Docket text modified on 3/4/2020 to correct description pursuant to instruction from chambers. (kbc)
March 2, 2020 Filing 39 RESPONSE re #1 Notice of Removal STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEDURE 9027(e)(3) by William Stevens (Gillispie, Joshua)
March 2, 2020 Filing 38 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Peter B. Janci re #32 Notice of Docket Correction re #12 Motion, #33 Notice of Docket Correction re #14 Motion, #34 Notice of Docket Correction re #18 Reply, #35 Notice of Docket Correction re #20 Reply. (fjg)
February 28, 2020 Filing 37 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Peter B. Janci re Notice of Docket Correction re #9 Order. (fjg)
February 25, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #16 Response. CORRECTION: The original document was attached to the docket in error (poor image quality) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added as an attachment to #16 docket entry and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (cmn)
February 24, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #20 Reply. CORRECTION: The original document was attached to the docket in error (poor image quality) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added as an attachment to #20 docket entry and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (cmn)
February 24, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #18 Reply. CORRECTION: The original document was attached to the docket in error (poor image quality) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added as an attachment to #18 docket entry and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (cmn)
February 24, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #14 Motion. CORRECTION: The original document was attached to the docket in error (poor image quality) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added as an attachment to #14 docket entry and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (cmn)
February 24, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #12 Motion. CORRECTION: The original document was attached to the docket in error (poor image quality) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added as an attachment to #12 docket entry and is attached hereto for review by the parties.(cmn)
February 21, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #9 Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to include the text "Signed by Pulaski County Circuit Judge Chris Piazza." (thd)
February 18, 2020 Filing 31 AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Pulaski County Circuit Judge Chris Piazza. (ajt)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER APPROVING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting Plaintiff William Steven's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Stephen F. Crew. Signed by Pulaski County Circuit Judge Chris Piazza.(ajt)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER APPROVING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting Plaintiff William Steven's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Peter B. Janci. Signed by Pulaski County Circuit Judge Chris Piazza. (ajt)
February 18, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart P. Miller on behalf of Boy Scouts of America, Quapaw Area Council Incorporated of the Boy Scouts of America. (ajt)
February 18, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by John Alexander on behalf of Boy Scouts of America, Quapaw Area Council Incorporated of the Boy Scouts of America. (ajt)
February 18, 2020 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 MOTION for Reconsideration re #9 Order filed by William Stevens. (ajt)
February 18, 2020 Filing 25 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #24 Motion to Dismiss and Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration and to Set Aside Judgment filed by Boy Scouts of America, Quapaw Area Council Incorporated of the Boy Scouts of America. (ajt)
February 18, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss and Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration and to Set Aside Judgment by Boy Scouts of America, Quapaw Area Council Incorporated of the Boy Scouts of America. (ajt)
February 18, 2020 Filing 23 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #22 Motion for Reconsideration filed by William Stevens. (ajt)
February 18, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Reconsideration and to Set Aside Judgment re #9 Order by William Stevens. (ajt)
February 18, 2020 Filing 21 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #20 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Quapaw Area Council Incorporated of the Boy Scouts of America. (ajt)
February 18, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Quapaw Area Council Incorporated of the Boy Scouts of America. (ajt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/24/2020: #1 Main Document - Correct) (cmn).
February 18, 2020 Filing 19 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #18 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Boy Scouts of America. (ajt)
February 18, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Boy Scouts of America. (ajt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/24/2020: #1 Main Document - Correct) (cmn).
February 18, 2020 Filing 17 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #16 Response to Motion filed by James Allen, Lavell Campbell. (ajt)
February 18, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #12 Motion to Dismiss and #14 Motion to Dismiss filed by James Allen, Lavell Campbell. (ajt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/25/2020: #1 Main Document - Correct) (cmn).
February 18, 2020 Filing 15 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #14 Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Quapaw Area Council Incorporated of the Boy Scouts of America. (ajt)
February 18, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment by Quapaw Area Council Incorporated of the Boy Scouts of America. (ajt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/24/2020: #1 Main Document - Correct) (cmn).
February 18, 2020 Filing 13 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #12 Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Boy Scouts of America. (ajt)
February 18, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment by Boy Scouts of America. (ajt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/24/2020: #1 Main Document - Correct) (cmn).
February 18, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #8 Second Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Quapaw Area Council Incorporated of the Boy Scouts of America.(ajt)
February 18, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #8 Second Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Boy Scouts of America.(ajt)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Defendants Boy Scouts of America and Quapaw Area Council Incorporated of the Boy Scouts of America's Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Pulaski County Circuit Judge Chris Piazza.(ajt) (Docket text modified on 2/21/2020 to include the signer.) (thd).
February 18, 2020 Filing 8 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by William Stevens, James Allen, Lavell Campbell.(ajt)
February 18, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Quapaw Area Council Incorporated of the Boy Scouts of America.(ajt)
February 18, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Boy Scouts of America.(ajt)
February 18, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by William Stevens.(ajt)
February 18, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Quapaw Area Council Incorporated of the Boy Scouts of America.(ajt)
February 18, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Boy Scouts of America.(ajt)
February 18, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by William Stevens.(ajt)
February 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Boy Scouts of America from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-18-3729. Fee $400 paid, receipt number LIT076087. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevens et al v. Boy Scouts of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Allen
Represented By: Joshua D. Gillispie
Represented By: Stephen F. Crew
Represented By: Peter B. Janci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Stevens
Represented By: Joshua D. Gillispie
Represented By: Stephen F. Crew
Represented By: Peter B. Janci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lavell Campbell
Represented By: Joshua D. Gillispie
Represented By: Stephen F. Crew
Represented By: Peter B. Janci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boy Scouts of America
Represented By: Stuart P. Miller
Represented By: John Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quapaw Area Council Incorporated of the Boy Scouts of America
Represented By: Stuart P. Miller
Represented By: John Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?