Olson v. Desert Lake Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: Chris Olson
Defendant: Peter Gallic, OZN Web LLC, Darin Toone, John Does, Chris Armstrong, Desert Lake Group LLC, Sociallity LLC, Desert Lake Group LLC doing business as First Class Herb Tincture doing business as First Class Herbalist CBD doing business as Herbalist Oils doing business as Herbalist Silver doing business as Herbalist Sleep and Sociallity LLC doing business as Sociallity Accessnow Health Community doing business as Sociality Group
Case Number: 4:2020cv00165
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Filing 13 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Sociallity LLC. (kdr)
April 6, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Entry of Default (Request for Entry by the Clerk) by Chris Olson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SOS SEARCH, #2 Exhibit B - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE, #3 Exhibit C - USPS TRACKING, #4 Exhibit D - DECL. OF JAMES STREETT)(Leniski, Joe)
March 19, 2020 Summons Issued as to Peter Gallic and returned via mail to attorney for plaintiff. (jap)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Pursuant to #10 parties' stipulations of dismissal and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), defendants Darin Toone and Chris Armstrong are dismissed without prejudice. The #4 motion to dismiss is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/18/2020. (kdr)
March 13, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice as to Seperate Defendants Darren Toone and Chris Armstrong only by Chris Olson. (Streett, James)
March 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Joe P. Leniski, Jr on behalf of Chris Olson (Leniski, Joe)
February 26, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by OZN Web LLC (Walker, Byron)
February 26, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Desert Lake Group LLC (Walker, Byron)
February 26, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Chris Armstrong, Desert Lake Group LLC, OZN Web LLC, Darin Toone.(Walker, Byron)
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 Motion to Dismiss filed by Chris Armstrong, Darin Toone. (Walker, Byron)
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Chris Armstrong, Darin Toone (Walker, Byron)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Extending Time for Service of Summons. Signed by Pope County Circuit Court Judge on 1/22/2020. (kdr)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief Under the Telephone Consumer Protection Act, 47 U.S.C. 227, and the Arkansas Civil Action by Crime Victims Act, Ark. Code Ann. 16-118-107 with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Chris Olson. (kdr)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chris Armstrong, Desert Lake Group LLC, OZN Web LLC, Darin Toone from Pope County Circuit Court, case number 58CV-19-606. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT076103. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olson v. Desert Lake Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Gallic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OZN Web LLC
Represented By: Joseph Christopher Hall
Represented By: Byron Jansen Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darin Toone
Represented By: Joseph Christopher Hall
Represented By: Byron Jansen Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Armstrong
Represented By: Joseph Christopher Hall
Represented By: Byron Jansen Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desert Lake Group LLC
Represented By: Joseph Christopher Hall
Represented By: Byron Jansen Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sociallity LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desert Lake Group LLC doing business as First Class Herb Tincture doing business as First Class Herbalist CBD doing business as Herbalist Oils doing business as Herbalist Silver doing business as Herbalist Sleep
Represented By: Joseph Christopher Hall
Represented By: Byron Jansen Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sociallity LLC doing business as Sociallity Accessnow Health Community doing business as Sociality Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Olson
Represented By: James A. Streett
Represented By: Joe P. Leniski, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?