Bennett v. AT&T Mobility Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Debra Bennett
Defendant: AT&T Mobility Services LLC, Peggy L Fletcher, Chad McKinley and AT&T Services Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv00166
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss as to Certain Claims filed by AT&T Mobility Services LLC, AT&T Services Inc, Peggy L Fletcher. (Madison, Eva)
April 3, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #13 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to include reference to the Jury demand as marked on the document. (jak)
April 2, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint with Jury demand by Peggy L Fletcher.(Madison, Eva) (Docket text modified on 4/3/2020 to include reference to the Jury demand)(jak)
March 23, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss as to Certain Claims by Debra Bennett (Gillham, Lucien)
March 13, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Debra Bennett. Peggy L Fletcher served on 3/12/2020. (Gillham, Lucien)
March 11, 2020 Filing 10 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #9 Motion to Dismiss (Partial) filed by AT&T Mobility Services LLC, AT&T Services Inc. (Madison, Eva)
March 11, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) by AT&T Mobility Services LLC, AT&T Services Inc (Madison, Eva)
March 10, 2020 Summons Issued as to Peggy L Fletcher, Chad McKinley and returned to counsel for service. (fjg)
February 26, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against AT&T Mobility Services LLC, AT&T Services Inc, Peggy L Fletcher, Chad McKinley, filed by Debra Bennett(Sutter, Luther)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 02/21/2020. (bgr)
February 21, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Debra Bennett (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint)(Gillham, Lucien)
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by AT&T Mobility Services LLC, AT&T Services Inc (Madison, Eva)
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Eva C. Madison on behalf of AT&T Mobility Services LLC, AT&T Services Inc. (bmd)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Hobbs Benson on behalf of AT&T Mobility Services LLC, AT&T Services Inc. (bmd)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Debra Bennett.(bmd)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AT&T Mobility Services LLC, AT&T Services Inc from Drew County Circuit Court, case number 22CV-20-11. Fee $400 paid, receipt number LIT076118. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett v. AT&T Mobility Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility Services LLC
Represented By: Margaret Hobbs Benson
Represented By: Eva C. Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy L Fletcher
Represented By: Eva C. Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad McKinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Services Inc
Represented By: Margaret Hobbs Benson
Represented By: Eva C. Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Bennett
Represented By: Lucien Ramseur Gillham
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?