CBE Tennis Inc et al v. Colony Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Bill Dirst, CBE Tennis Inc, Cannon Fletcher and Eric Korita
Defendant: Colony Specialty Insurance Company, Timothy Dunlavey, Argo Group US Inc and Colony Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00176
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #10 Amended Complaint. Argo Group US Inc answer due 5/1/2020; Timothy Dunlavey answer due 5/1/2020. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 3/31/2020. (sjh)
March 31, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #10 Amended Complaint by Argo Group US Inc, Timothy Dunlavey (Wineland, Teresa)
March 18, 2020 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CBE Tennis Inc, Bill Dirst, Cannon Fletcher, Eric Korita. (Mizell, Emily)
March 18, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Cannon Fletcher, CBE Tennis Inc, Bill Dirst, Eric Korita (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Insurance Policy, #2 Exhibit B, Correspondence)(Mizell, Emily)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; finding as moot #3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim based upon the amendments. Plaintiff must filed the Amended Complaint on or before March 20,2020. If Plaintiff fails to file the amendments, Defendants may re-file the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 3/18/2020. (sjh)
March 11, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Incorporated Brief by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A to Exhibit 1 to Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit B to Exhibit 1 to Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint)(Mizell, Emily)
March 11, 2020 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 Response to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Brief in Support of Response to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Brief in Support of Response to Motion to Dismiss)(Mizell, Emily)
March 11, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by All Plaintiffs. (Mizell, Emily)
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Timothy Dunlavey.(Fields, Larry)
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Argo Group US Inc, Colony Specialty Insurance Company. (Fields, Larry)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Argo Group US Inc, Colony Specialty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy)(Fields, Larry)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Cannon Fletcher, CBE Tennis Inc, Bill Dirst, Eric Korita. (ljb)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Pulaski County Circuit Court, Case Number 60CV-20-801. Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT076131. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CBE Tennis Inc et al v. Colony Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colony Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Teresa M. Wineland
Represented By: Larry David Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Dunlavey
Represented By: Teresa M. Wineland
Represented By: Larry David Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Argo Group US Inc
Represented By: Teresa M. Wineland
Represented By: Larry David Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colony Insurance Company
Represented By: Teresa M. Wineland
Represented By: Larry David Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Dirst
Represented By: Todd Patrick Lewis
Represented By: Emily Christel Mizell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CBE Tennis Inc
Represented By: Todd Patrick Lewis
Represented By: Emily Christel Mizell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cannon Fletcher
Represented By: Todd Patrick Lewis
Represented By: Emily Christel Mizell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Korita
Represented By: Todd Patrick Lewis
Represented By: Emily Christel Mizell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?