Ashley v. Wright
Plaintiff: Ricky Ashley
Defendant: Susan Webber Wright
Case Number: 4:2020cv00246
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Central Division Office
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Filing 12 APPEAL DEFICIENCY NOTICE re #6 Appellate Filing Fee Notice, #5 Notice of Appeal. (ajt)
March 20, 2020 Filing 11 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (ljb)
March 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #8 Order. CORRECTION: The original document was attached to the docket in error (wrong image file) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added as an attachment to #8 docket entry and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (cmn)
March 20, 2020 Filing 9 JUDGMENT: Ashley's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/20/2020. (ljb)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #1 Application to proceed in forma pauperis; and dismissing without prejudice #2 complaint. If Ashley wants to pursue this case, then he must pay the $400 filing and administrative fees and file a motion to reopen the case by 04/16/2020. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 03/20/2020. (ajt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/20/2020: #1 Main Document - Correct) (cmn).
March 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #6 Appellate Filing Fee Notice. CORRECTION: The original document was attached to the docket in error (wrong image file) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added as an attachment to #6 docket entry and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (cmn)
March 18, 2020 Filing 6 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. Response due by 4/17/2020. (ajt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/18/2020: #1 Main Document - Correct) (cmn).
March 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #3 Order of Recusal by Ricky Ashley. (ajt)
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #3 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. (jak)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign the above styled case. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/13/2020. (jbh)
March 4, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Susan Webber Wright filed by Ricky Ashley. (Blank pages submitted intentionally left out pursuant to instruction from law clerk.) (ljb)
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ricky Ashley. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashley v. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Webber Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?