Bartolomei v. National Republic Congressional Committee et al
Plaintiff: Bartolomei and Leslie Bartolomei
Defendant: National Republic Congressional Committee and Winred Technical Services LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00271
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:521
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #15 the Motion to Stay and denying without prejudice #9 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The parties are directed to file a motion to lift stay after the Supreme Court issues an opinion in Barr v. American Association of Political Consultants, Inc., No. 19-631. Defendants may file their motions to dismiss after the stay is lifted. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 05/07/20. (dmm)
May 7, 2020 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Stay on behalf of all parties by National Republic Congressional Committee, Winred Technical Services LLC (Torchinsky, Jason)
May 7, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Ryan Younger on behalf of Winred Technical Services LLC (Younger, Robert)
May 7, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Brett Torchinsky on behalf of Winred Technical Services LLC (Torchinsky, Jason)
May 7, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Tull, III on behalf of Winred Technical Services LLC (Tull, John)
May 5, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by National Republic Congressional Committee of Constitutional Challenge of Statute (Torchinsky, Jason)
May 4, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to remove reference to the Memorandum in Support filed as an attachment to docket entry #9 in error. The Memorandum in Support was filed by the Clerk's office as a separate document and assigned docket entry #10 . (jak)
May 4, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by National Republic Congressional Committee. [Filed as a separate document by the Clerk's office. Docketed originally as an attachment to docket entry in #9 in error] (jak)
May 4, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by National Republic Congressional Committee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1.(Torchinsky, Jason)(Docket text modified on 5/4/2020 to remove reference to the brief filed as an attachment in error) (jak)
May 4, 2020 Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 7/13/2020. Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/27/2020. Jury Trial set for 5/4/2021 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 5/4/20. (mmb)
May 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Ryan Younger on behalf of National Republic Congressional Committee (Younger, Robert)
May 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Tull, III on behalf of National Republic Congressional Committee (Tull, John)
May 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Brett Torchinsky on behalf of National Republic Congressional Committee (Torchinsky, Jason)
April 1, 2020 Summons Issued as to National Republic Congressional Committee and Winred Technical Services LLC. Returned to plaintiff's attorney for service. (kdr)
March 28, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #4 Amended Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the document is filed against "all Defendants". (thd)
March 27, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against all Defendants, filed by Leslie Bartolomei (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Unknown Tortfeasors)(Bautista, Jose) (Docket text modified on 3/28/2020 to indicate the document is filed against "all Defendants".) (thd).
March 17, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT". (thd)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Adrian R. Bacon is admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/16/20. (mmb)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Adrian Bacon. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3662167. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Adrian Bacon, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing)(Zachary, Justin)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Leslie Bartolomei. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT076470.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bartolomei v. National Republic Congressional Committee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Republic Congressional Committee
Represented By: Robert Ryan Younger
Represented By: Jason Brett Torchinsky
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winred Technical Services LLC
Represented By: Robert Ryan Younger
Represented By: Jason Brett Torchinsky
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bartolomei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Bartolomei
Represented By: Adrian Bacon
Represented By: Jose M. Bautista
Represented By: Justin C. Zachary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?