Turley v. American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida et al
Plaintiff: Jerry Turley
Defendant: Underwriters at Lloyds London and American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida
Case Number: 4:2020cv00279
Filed: March 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 Filing 17 STATEMENT OF FACTS (Local Rule 56.1) re #15 Motion for Summary Judgment Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Defendant Underwriters at Lloyds London's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Underwriters at Lloyds London. (King, Andrew)
May 15, 2020 Filing 16 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #15 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Underwriters at Lloyds London. (King, Andrew)
May 15, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Underwriters at Lloyds London (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(King, Andrew)
May 11, 2020 Filing 14 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. (Heister, Michael)
May 11, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida (Heister, Michael)
March 24, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Underwriters at Lloyds London (King, Andrew)
March 24, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Underwriters at Lloyds London.(King, Andrew)
March 23, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida (Heister, Michael)
March 19, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha R. Wilson on behalf of American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida (Wilson, Samantha)
March 19, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Heister, Michael)
March 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Bailey Heister on behalf of American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida (Heister, Michael)
March 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew King on behalf of Underwriters at Lloyds London (King, Andrew)
March 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by McKenzie L. Raub on behalf of Underwriters at Lloyds London (Raub, McKenzie)
March 19, 2020 Filing 4 REPLY re #1 Notice of Removal Consent to Removal by Underwriters at Lloyds London. (King, Andrew)
March 17, 2020 Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 5/26/2020. Rule 26(f) Report due by 6/8/2020. Jury Trial set for 3/16/2021 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 3/17/20. (mmb)
March 17, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Jerry Turley. (jbh)
March 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-20-01340. Fee of $400 paid; receipt number LIT076504. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turley v. American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Underwriters at Lloyds London
Represented By: Andrew King
Represented By: McKenzie L. Raub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida
Represented By: Samantha R. Wilson
Represented By: Michael Bailey Heister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Turley
Represented By: James F. Swindoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?