Newby et al v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London
Plaintiff: Earl Newby and Beverly Newby
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London
Case Number: 4:2020cv00292
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Filing 12 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London. (Wilson, Lisa)
April 20, 2020 Filing 11 Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing to Policy Number FLA02203's Original ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London.(Wilson, Lisa)
April 6, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, filed by Earl Newby, Beverly Newby(Baxter, James)
March 26, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #7 and #8 Notices of Appearance. CORRECTION: The original documents contained editable image files. The corrected document were added as attachments to docket entries #7 and #8 based on the attached correspondence. (thd)
March 25, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James Price Collins on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London (Collins, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/26/2020: #1 Main Document - Correct) (thd).
March 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa M. Wilson on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London (Wilson, Lisa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/26/2020: #1 Main Document - Correct) (thd).
March 24, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London (Wilson, Lisa)
March 24, 2020 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Which Relief Can Be Granted Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London. (Wilson, Lisa)
March 24, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Which Relief Can Be Granted Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London (Wilson, Lisa)
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Notice of Removal and #2 Complaint. CORRECTION: The original document #1 was attached to the docket in error (incorrect file date) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added as an attachment to #1 docket entry and is attached hereto for review by the parties. Docket entries #1 and #2 were modified to correct the date filed as 3/18/2020 as marked on the document. (cmn)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London filed by Earl Newby, Beverly Newby.(bmd) (Docket entry modified on 3/19/2020 to correct date filed and party name.)(cmn)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London from Faulkner County Circuit Court, case number 23CV-20-244. Fee $400 received, receipt number LIT076532. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/19/2020: #2 Main Document - Correct) (cmn) (Docket entry modified on 3/19/2020 to correct date filed and party name.)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newby et al v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Newby
Represented By: J. Ray Baxter
Represented By: James Ryburn Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Newby
Represented By: J. Ray Baxter
Represented By: James Ryburn Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London
Represented By: Lisa M. Wilson
Represented By: James Price Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?