Six Hogs, LLC v. Doe et al
Plaintiff: Six Hogs LLC
Defendant: John Doe and Samsonico USA LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00338
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Six Hogs LLC (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion)(Montague, William)
May 4, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #36 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the Counterclaim is filed against Plaintiff Six Hogs LLC and to remove the reference to a Jury Demand. (thd)
May 1, 2020 Filing 36 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, First COUNTERCLAIM against Six Hogs LLC by Samsonico USA LLC.(Calhoun, Joseph) (Docket text modified on 5/4/2020 to indicate the Counterclaim is filed against Plaintiff and to remove the reference to a Jury Demand.) (thd).
April 30, 2020 Filing 35 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 6/29/2020; Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/13/2020; Bench Trial set for sometime during the week of 6/7/2021 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4C before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 04/30/2020. (tmw)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #31 motion to withdraw James M. Francis as counsel of record for Samsonico; directing the Clerk of Court to terminate Mr. Francis as counsel of record for Samsonico; and denying #27 Samsonico's motion for leave to conduct jurisdictional discovery on an expedited basis, and motion for extension of time to respond to complaint. Samsonico may file a new motion for an extension of time to respond to the complaint in compliance with the Local Rules. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/29/2020. (jbh)
April 27, 2020 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION for Leave to File Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery on an Expedited Basis, and Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Six Hogs LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Counsel correspondence (01-09-20), #2 Exhibit B - Counsel correspondence (04-10-20))(Montague, William)
April 23, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #31 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed pursuant to the attached correspondence. (jak)
April 23, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Samsonico USA LLC and John Doe dba Samsonico International Inc. (Calhoun, Joseph) (Docket text modified on 4/23/2020 to correct the description of the document filed) (jak)
April 15, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by George David McClure, Jr on behalf of Six Hogs LLC (McClure, George)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #26 joint motion for enlargement of time; and extending defendants' deadline to file a response to plaintiff Six Hogs, LLC's complaint until and including 5/1/2020. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/15/2020. (jbh)
April 13, 2020 Filing 28 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #27 Motion for Leave to File Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery on an Expedited Basis filed by Samsonico USA LLC. (Calhoun, Joseph)
April 13, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to File Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery on an Expedited Basis, and Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Samsonico USA LLC (Calhoun, Joseph)
April 13, 2020 Filing 26 Joint MOTION to Extend Time by Samsonico USA LLC (Calhoun, Joseph)
April 13, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Davidson Calhoun, III on behalf of Samsonico USA LLC (Calhoun, Joseph)
April 10, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by William L. Montague, Jr on behalf of Six Hogs LLC (Montague, William)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 motion for admission pro hac vice of attorney G. David McClure, Jr.; and granting #22 motion for admission pro hac vice of attorney William L. Montague, Jr. Mr. McClure and Mr. Montague shall appear as counsel for Six Hogs. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/7/2020. (jbh)
April 6, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by William L. Montague, Jr.. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3677728. Filed by Six Hogs LLC (Glasgow, Richard)
April 6, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by G. David McClure, Jr., Ph.D.. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3677710. Filed by Six Hogs LLC (Glasgow, Richard)
March 30, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Blakely Glasgow on behalf of Six Hogs LLC (Glasgow, Richard)
March 26, 2020 Filing 19 Case electronically transferred in from the U.S. District Court, Eastern District of Kentucky; Case Number 6:20-cv-00001. Copy of transfer order, case file, and docket sheet received.
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AGREED ORDER #17 Proposed Agreed Order to transfer venue by Six Hogs, LLC : hereby ORDERS that this action, Civil Case No. 6:20-CV-01-KKC, be transferred pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas, Central Division. The Court directs the Courts Clerk to take steps necessary to effectuate such transfer. Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 3/26/20.(SYD)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 3/26/2020.]
March 26, 2020 ***file SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Karen K. Caldwell for review: re #17 Proposed Agreed Order to transfer venue by Six Hogs, LLC (SYD) [Transferred from kyed on 3/26/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 17 Proposed Agreed Order to transfer venue by Six Hogs, LLC. (Montague, William) Modified text on 3/26/2020 (SYD). [Transferred from kyed on 3/26/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AGREED ORDER #15 by Six Hogs, LLC : Plaintiff may file a memorandum in response to Defendants' Motion To Dismiss [DE #12 ] on or before March 25, 2020. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 3/20/20.(SYD)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 3/26/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 15 Proposed Agreed Order by Six Hogs, LLC. (Montague, William) [Transferred from kyed on 3/26/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AGREED ORDER: It hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff may file a memorandum in response to Defendants' Motion To Dismiss [DE #12 ] on or before March 20, 2020. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 03/12/2020.(KJA)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 3/26/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 13 Proposed Agreed Order by Six Hogs, LLC. (Montague, William) [Transferred from kyed on 3/26/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Samsonico USA LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration, #3 Exhibit B - Letter to Plaintiff, #4 Proposed Order)(Francis, James) [Transferred from kyed on 3/26/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint : The new deadline to Answer or Respond to the Complaint is February 21, 2020. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 2/12/20.(SYD)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 3/26/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by John Doe, Samsonico USA LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Francis, James) [Transferred from kyed on 3/26/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Doe, Samsonico USA LLC. (Francis, James) [Transferred from kyed on 3/26/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Six Hogs, LLC via personal service to John Doe served on 1/21/2020, answer due 2/11/2020. (Montague, William) [Transferred from kyed on 3/26/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Six Hogs, LLC via personal service on registered agent to Samsonico USA LLC served on 1/21/2020, answer due 2/11/2020. (Montague, William) [Transferred from kyed on 3/26/2020.]
January 4, 2020 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Six Hogs, LLC. (Montague, William) [Transferred from kyed on 3/26/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint cc: form e-mailed to Register. (MM) [Transferred from kyed on 3/26/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Conflict Check run. (MM) [Transferred from kyed on 3/26/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, William L. Montague, Jr.. #1 Complaint has been filed by Six Hogs, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (MM) [Transferred from kyed on 3/26/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to John Doe, Samsonico USA LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons Samsonico USA LLC)(MM) [Transferred from kyed on 3/26/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4558984), filed by Six Hogs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons John Doe dba Samsonico International Inc., #3 Summons Samsonico USA LLC)(MM) [Transferred from kyed on 3/26/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Six Hogs, LLC v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Six Hogs LLC
Represented By: William L. Montague, Jr.
Represented By: George David McClure, Jr.
Represented By: Richard Blakely Glasgow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Represented By: James M. Francis
Represented By: Joseph Davidson Calhoun, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsonico USA LLC
Represented By: James M. Francis
Represented By: Joseph Davidson Calhoun, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?