Triosim Coporation v. Drake
Plaintiff: Triosim Coporation
Defendant: A Dale Drake
Case Number: 4:2020cv00395
Filed: April 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE by Triosim Coporation re #26 Order on Motion for TRO, Notice of Filing (Attachments: #1 Injunction Bond)(Shelton, Henry)
June 2, 2020 Filing 28 AMENDED INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/1/2020 and Jury Trial reset for 4/19/2021 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #2A before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 6/2/2020. (hml)
June 1, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #26 Order. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office (wrong image file). The correct document was added to docket entry #26 and is attached hereto for service on the parties. (jak)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 05/29/2020. (ajt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/1/2020: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak).
May 26, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE re #24 Memorandum Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Memorandum Proposing Preliminary Injunction Clauses by A Dale Drake (Murphy, Guy)
May 26, 2020 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Triosim Coporation. Plaintiff's Memorandum Proposing Preliminary Injunction Clauses (Shelton, Henry)
May 22, 2020 Filing 23 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction held on 5/21/2020, before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Court Reporter Margaret M. Kruse. Transcript may be viewed only at the public terminals in the Clerk's office. Copies of transcript are only available through the Official Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. DEADLINES: Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 5/29/2020. Redaction Request due 6/12/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/22/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2020. (cmn)
May 21, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE by Triosim Coporation Notice of Filing (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Warren Flenniken)(Shelton, Henry)
May 21, 2020 Filing 21 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) CLERK'S MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky: Motion Hearing held on 5/21/2020 re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Triosim Coporation. Court heard argument from the parties and took the matter under advisement. Court to issue order under separate entry. (Plaintiff: Henry Shelton; Defendant: Guy Murphy, Jr., Jim Patterson, and via telephone James Hyden; Court Reporter Margie Kruse.) (hml)
May 20, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Defendant's Sur-Reply Regarding Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplemental Affidavit of A. Dale Drake)(Murphy, Guy)
May 19, 2020 Filing 19 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 8/10/2020 and Jury Trial set for 7/19/2021 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #2A before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 5/19/2020. (hml)
May 18, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Triosim Coporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Shelton, Henry)
May 13, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of A. Dale Drake, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Ian Clarke, #3 Exhibit Sales Agreement, #4 Exhibit February 18, 2016 Letter)(Murphy, Guy)
May 12, 2020 Filing 16 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE of Hearing on #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction: Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2020 at 9:00 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #2A before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. (hml)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER directing Defendant to respond to #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by 11:59 pm on Wednesday, May 13, 2020. Plaintiff's Reply is due by 11:59 pm on Monday, May 18, 2020. The Court will aim to hold a preliminary injunction hearing on either May 20, May 21, or May 22. The Court will shortly be in touch with counsel to finalize a date and time for the hearing. The Court will also want to know whether either party wants to call witnesses at the hearing or if the hearing is simply for legal argument. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 05/07/2020. (bgr)
May 7, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Triosim Coporation re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Shelton, Henry)
May 7, 2020 Filing 13 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #12 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. (jak)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT directing the Clerk's Office to issue a Notice of Reassignment. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 05/07/2020. (ajt)
May 7, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #7 , #9 and #10 Notices of Appearance. CORRECTION: The original documents were submitted in an editable image format. The correct documents were added to docket entries #7 , #9 and #10 based on the attached correspondence.(jak) (Docket text modified on 5/8/2020 to correct a typographical error) (jak)
May 6, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James W. Hyden on behalf of All Defendants (Hyden, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2020: #1 Main Document - Correct (submitted 5/7/2020)) (jak).
May 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jimmie Samuel Patterson on behalf of All Defendants (Patterson, Jimmie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2020: #1 Main Document - Correct (Submitted 5/7/2020)) (jak).
May 6, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by A Dale Drake.(Murphy, Guy)
May 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Guy W. Murphy, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Murphy, Guy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2020: #1 Main Document - Correct (submitted 5/7/2020)) (jak).
May 6, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Triosim Coporation. Memorandum in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Shelton, Henry)
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Triosim Coporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Document Complaint)(Shelton, Henry)
April 17, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Verified Complaint for Injunctive Relief and Damages , filed by Triosim Coporation. A Dale Drake served on 4/16/2020. (Shelton, Henry)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 motion for admission pro hac vice of attorney Patrick H. Morris. Mr. Morris shall appear as counsel for plaintiff Triosim Corporation. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/17/2020. (jbh)
April 14, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Patrick H. Morris. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3682922. Filed by Triosim Coporation (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Patrick H. Morris)(Shelton, Henry)
April 13, 2020 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DAMAGES against A Dale Drake filed by Triosim Coporation. Fee $400 received. Receipt Number LIT076844. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Triosim Coporation v. Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Dale Drake
Represented By: James W. Hyden
Represented By: Jimmie Samuel Patterson
Represented By: Guy W. Murphy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Triosim Coporation
Represented By: Patrick H. Morris
Represented By: Henry C. Shelton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?