Evans v. Foster Jones et al
Plaintiff: Albert Evans
Defendant: George Wilson, Rory Griffin, Jorge Deminicis, Melanie Deborah Foster Jones, Melanie Jones and Jorge Dominicis
Case Number: 4:2020cv00405
Filed: April 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Joe J Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending #19 Defendant Dominicis's Motion to Dismiss be denied; and recommending the Court certify that an in forma pauperis appeal from any Order adopting these recommendations would not be taken in good faith. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 6/11/2020. (jbh)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Pursuant to the information provided in #18 Answer and #19 Motion to Dismiss, the Clerk is directed to change Defendants' names to Dr. Melanie Jones and Jorge Dominicis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 06/11/2020. (ajt)
June 9, 2020 Filing 20 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jorge Deminicis. (Odum, Michelle)
June 9, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Jorge Deminicis (Odum, Michelle)
June 9, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Melanie Deborah Foster Jones.(Odum, Michelle)
June 9, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Banks Odum on behalf of Jorge Deminicis, Melanie Deborah Foster Jones (Odum, Michelle)
May 26, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Rory Griffin served on 5/1/2020. (ajt)
May 18, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #2 Complaint by Albert Evans. (kdr)
May 13, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Rory Griffin.(Mosley, Michael)
May 13, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Allen Mosley on behalf of Rory Griffin (Mosley, Michael)
April 23, 2020 Filing 12 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction be denied #4 . Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 4/23/2020. (lej)
April 14, 2020 Summons Issued as to Jorge Deminicis, Melanie Deborah Foster Jones, Rory Griffin, George Wilson and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (jbh)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #1 IFP Application; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; and directing the Clerk to mail a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Wrightsville Unit, the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, and the ADC Compliance Office. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 4/14/2020. (jbh)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons and the USM to serve Defendants without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 4/14/2020. (lej)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying Plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel #3 . A civil litigant does not have a constitutional or statutory right to appointed counsel in a civil action but the Court may appoint counsel at its discretion. 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(1). The Court has considered Plaintiff's need for an attorney, the likelihood that Plaintiff will benefit from assistance of counsel, the factual complexity of the case, the Plaintiff's ability to investigate and present the case, and the complexity of the legal issues. In considering these factors, the Court finds that Plaintiff's claims do not appear legally or factually complex, and it appears Plaintiff is capable of prosecuting these claims without appointed counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 4/14/2020. (lej)
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 SET of INTERROGATORIES to Rory Griffin by Albert Evans. (llg)
April 13, 2020 Filing 7 FIRST SET of INTERROGATORIES to George Wilson by Albert Evans. (llg)
April 13, 2020 Filing 6 FIRST REQUEST for Production of Documents by Albert Evans. (llg)
April 13, 2020 Filing 5 FIRST SET of INTERROGATORIES to Defendants by Albert Evans. (llg)
April 13, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Albert Evans. (llg)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Albert Evans. (llg)
April 13, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Albert Evans. (llg)
April 13, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Albert Evans. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Foster Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rory Griffin
Represented By: Michael Allen Mosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Deminicis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie Deborah Foster Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie Jones
Represented By: Michelle Banks Odum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Dominicis
Represented By: Michelle Banks Odum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?