Lancaster v. Ligon et al
Plaintiff: James Patrick Lancaster
Defendant: Edward Adcock, Stark Ligon, Cathleen Compton, Daniel Hancock and Mike Lancaster
Case Number: 4:2020cv00407
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Filing 18 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Cathleen Compton, Stark Ligon. (Mosley, Michael)
June 11, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Cathleen Compton, Stark Ligon (Mosley, Michael)
June 11, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Allen Mosley on behalf of Cathleen Compton, Stark Ligon (Mosley, Michael)
June 9, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #15 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the denial of the motion is without prejudice as marked on the Order. (jak)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying without prejudice #14 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/8/2020. (jak) (Docket text modified on 6/9/2020 to indicate the denial of the motion is without prejudice) (jak)
June 1, 2020 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and mailed to Plaintiff for service. (jbh)
May 28, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by James Patrick Lancaster (jap)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #13 Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "ORDER extending the deadline for service to 8/26/2020. The Court directs the Clerk to issue summonses and mail them to Lancaster. Denying #7 , #8 motions requesting that the Court set aside a state court probate order as premature; denying #11 motion to hold Stark Ligon vicariously liable as premature; directing Lancaster to not file any more motions until the defendants have been served and have answered or otherwise appeared in the case. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/28/2020" as marked on the Order. (jak)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER extending the deadline for service to 8/26/2020. The Court directs the Clerk to issue summonses and mail them to Lancaster. Denying #7 , #8 motions requesting that the Court set aside a state court probate order as premature; denying #11 motion to hold Stark Ligon vicariously liable as premature; directing Lancaster to not file any more motions until the defendants have been served and have answered or otherwise appeared in the case. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/28/2020. (jbh) (Docket text modified on 5/28/2020 to correct the description of the document filed) (jak)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/27/2020. (jak)
May 26, 2020 Filing 11 PLAINTIFF'S Motion to Request the District Court to Hold Stark Ligon Vicariously Liable for the Crimes of His Co-Conspirators, by James Patrick Lancaster. (jap)
May 22, 2020 Filing 10 ADDENDUM filed by James Patrick Lancaster to #8 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION. (bmd)
May 20, 2020 Filing 9 Filing fee received. Amount $400.00, Receipt # LIT077313. (fjg)
May 18, 2020 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION for District Court to Set Aside Probate Judge Compton's Judgment by James Patrick Lancaster. (ljb)
May 14, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Request the District Court to Set Aside Probate Judge Compton's Judgment Obtained by Fraud on the Court by James Patrick Lancaster. (jap)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying without prejudice as incomplete #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. If Lancaster wants to pursue this case, he must either pay the filing fee or file a more complete IFP application by 6/15/2020. #4 and #5 Motions are denied without prejudice as premature. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/13/2020. (jak)
May 12, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Inform the Court by James Patrick Lancaster (jap)
May 11, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Relief Options and Consideration by James Patrick Lancaster (jap)
April 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #2 Complaint, #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. CORRECTION: The original documents were attached to docket entries #1 and #2 in error (wrong case numbers on documents) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct documents were added to docket entries #1 and #2 and are attached hereto for review by the parties. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak)
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by James Patrick Lancaster. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/15/2020: #2 Complaint - Main Document (Correct), #3 Civil Cover Sheet Correct) (jak).
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Patrick Lancaster. (jbh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/15/2020: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lancaster v. Ligon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Adcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stark Ligon
Represented By: Michael Allen Mosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathleen Compton
Represented By: Michael Allen Mosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Patrick Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?