Jackson v. Higgins et al
Case Number: 4:2020cv00433
Filed: April 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (ajt)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 JUDGMENT: Pursuant to #3 Order entered in this matter on this date, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 06/10/2020. (ajt)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER dismissing without prejudice #1 Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 06/10/2020. (ajt)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing Plaintiff Jackson to submit the $400 statutory filing fee or an In Forma Pauperis Motion within 30 days of the entry date of this Order; and directing the Clerk to send to Plaintiff an In Forma Pauperis Motion, together with the filing fee calculation sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 04/21/2020. (ajt)
April 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Darrin Jackson. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Higgins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?