Goodhart v. Visser Trucking LLC et al
Plaintiff: Maria Hernandez Goodhart
Defendant: Wayne R Detra, John Does, Detra Transport LLC and Visser Trucking LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00455
Filed: April 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Filing 11 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 8/9/2021 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #2A before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Motions to Amend and Join Other Parties due by 1/20/2021; Discovery due by 2/19/2021; Motions due by 3/22/2021; Status Report due by 3/22/2021; and Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 6/18/2021. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 6/17/2020. (hml)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Court finds that consolidation of these two actions is appropriate. Case number 4:20-CV-00455, is hereby designated the lead case and all future pleadings are to be filed in the lead case. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 06/17/2020. (ajt)
June 15, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Dustin M Lamb. (Stein, Carter)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 the parties' joint motion to consolidate; consolidating Lamb v. Detra, et al, Case No. 4:20-cv-00426 BSM with Goodhart v. Visser Trucking, LLC, et al., Case No. 4:20-CV-455 LPR; and directing the Clerk to reassign Lamb v. Detra, et al, Case No. 4:20-cv-00426 BSM to Judge Rudofsky (Originally docketed in member case 4:20-cv-00426-BSM). Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/3/2020. (jbh)
May 15, 2020 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Wayne R Detra, Detra Transport LLC, Visser Trucking LLC (Comstock, Christina)
April 28, 2020 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/20/2020 and Jury Trial set for 7/19/2021 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #2A before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 4/28/2020. (hml)
April 27, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Detra Transport LLC. (ljb)
April 27, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Visser Trucking LLC. (ljb)
April 27, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Wayne R Detra, Detra Transport LLC, Visser Trucking LLC. (ljb)
April 27, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Maria Hernandez Goodhart. (ljb)
April 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL AND JURY DEMAND by Wayne R Detra, Detra Transport LLC, Visser Trucking LLC from Pulaski County Circuit Court, Case Number 60CV-20-2712. Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT076992. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodhart v. Visser Trucking LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne R Detra
Represented By: Ezra Jeremiah Smith
Represented By: Christina D. Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detra Transport LLC
Represented By: Ezra Jeremiah Smith
Represented By: Christina D. Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visser Trucking LLC
Represented By: Ezra Jeremiah Smith
Represented By: Christina D. Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Hernandez Goodhart
Represented By: James Felix Goodhart
Represented By: Bobby R. McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?