Yarbrough et al v. ARC DBPPROP001 LLC
Plaintiff: Stephanie Yarbrough and Billy D Yarbrough
Defendant: ARC DBPPROP001 LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00456
Filed: April 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #8 Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Time to Perfect Service. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 06/16/20. (dmm)
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Extend Time in Which to Complete Service of Process by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Document Brief in Support)(Abney, Robert)
June 3, 2020 Summons Issued as to ARC DBPPROP001 LLC and returned to counsel for service. (fjg)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Lisa M. Peters is admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/1/20. (mmb)
April 30, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Lisa M. Peters. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3694740. Filed by ARC DBPPROP001 LLC (King, Andrew)
April 28, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by ARC DBPPROP001 LLC (King, Andrew)
April 28, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by ARC DBPPROP001 LLC.(King, Andrew)
April 27, 2020 Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 7/6/2020. Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/20/2020. Bench Trial set for 4/27/2021 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson.. Entered at the direction of the Court on 4/27/20. (mmb)
April 27, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against ARC DBPPROP001 LLC filed by Billy D Yarbrough, Stephanie Yarbrough. (ljb)
April 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ARC DBPPROP001 LLC from White County Circuit Court, Case Number 73CV-20-223. Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT076995. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yarbrough et al v. ARC DBPPROP001 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Yarbrough
Represented By: Robert M. Abney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy D Yarbrough
Represented By: Robert M. Abney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARC DBPPROP001 LLC
Represented By: Andrew King
Represented By: McKenzie L. Raub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?