Wilson v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Tammy Lynn Wilson
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2020cv00468
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Referring Judge: Joe J Volpe
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey A. Wirmani on behalf of Social Security Administration (Wirmani, Tracey)
June 3, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #6 Summons Returned Executed as to USA. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the date of service as 5/11/2020 as marked on the document. (jak)
May 30, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tammy Lynn Wilson. Social Security Administration served on 5/11/2020. (Long, Martin) (Docket text modified on 6/3/2020 to include the date of service) (jak)
April 30, 2020 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to counsel for service. (ljb)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting permission to proceed in forma pauperis #1 #2 . The Clerk will issue summons without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 4/30/2020. (lej)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Persons by Tammy Lynn Wilson. (ljb)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration filed by Tammy Lynn Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION To File Complaint Without Payment of Fees by Tammy Lynn Wilson. (ljb)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tammy Lynn Wilson. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Lynn Wilson
Represented By: Martin W. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?