Wastewater Specialties LLC v. Clayton et al
Plaintiff: Wastewater Specialties LLC
Defendant: Stoney Courville and Charles P Clayton
Case Number: 4:2020cv00516
Filed: May 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #21 Notice of Appearance. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description as follows, "NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith McNeil Causey on behalf of Wastewater Specialties LLC" as marked on the document. (cmn)
July 6, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith McNeil Causey on behalf of Wastewater Specialties LLC (Heister, Michael) (Docket entry modified on 7/7/2020 to correct the attorney.)(cmn)
July 2, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration by Wastewater Specialties LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Heister, Michael)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting in part #17 motion to extend the temporary restraining order. The TRO is extended until a hearing on plaintiffs' request for a preliminary injunction can be held, not to exceed fourteen days from the time of this order, without good cause shown. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/1/2020. (jbh)
June 30, 2020 Filing 18 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #17 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Wastewater Specialties LLC. (Heister, Michael)
June 30, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and to Extend Temporary Restraining Order by Wastewater Specialties LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Heister, Michael)
June 26, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by All Defendants. (Murphy, Guy)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER extending #5 the temporary restraining order until a hearing can held, not to exceed 14 days from the time of this order, without good cause shown. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/16/2020. (kdr)
June 12, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Bailey Heister on behalf of Wastewater Specialties LLC (Heister, Michael)
June 12, 2020 Filing 13 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #12 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Wastewater Specialties LLC. (Peel, John)
June 12, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Wastewater Specialties LLC (Peel, John)
May 28, 2020 Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 7/23/2020; Rule 26(f) Report due by 8/5/2020; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 11/8/2021 at 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the direction of the Court on 05/28/2020. (rmg)
May 15, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #8 Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the signature of the Order as "Signed at the Direction of the Court on 5/15/2020" as marked on the document. (jak)
May 15, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Charles P Clayton, Stoney Courville.(Murphy, Guy)
May 15, 2020 Filing 9 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #8 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Brian S. Miller. (jak)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing the Clerk's Office to issue a Notice of Reassignment. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 05/15/2020. (ajt) (Docket text modified on 5/15/2020 to correct the signature of the Order)(jak)
May 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jimmie Samuel Patterson on behalf of All Defendants (Patterson, Jimmie)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Circuit Judge Dennis C. Sutterfield. (ajt)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Circuit Judge Dennis C. Sutterfield. (ajt)
May 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by James Lloyd Phillips, III on behalf of All Defendants (Phillips, James)
May 15, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Charles P Clayton, Stoney Courville filed by Wastewater Specialties LLC.(ajt)
May 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Guy W. Murphy, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Murphy, Guy)
May 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Charles P Clayton, Stoney Courville from Pope County Circuit Court, case number 58CV-20-198. Fee $400 paid, receipt number LIT077264. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wastewater Specialties LLC v. Clayton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wastewater Specialties LLC
Represented By: John Richard Peel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stoney Courville
Represented By: James Lloyd Phillips, III
Represented By: Jimmie Samuel Patterson
Represented By: Guy W. Murphy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles P Clayton
Represented By: James Lloyd Phillips, III
Represented By: Jimmie Samuel Patterson
Represented By: Guy W. Murphy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?