Tetronics (International) Limited v. BlueOak Arkansas LLC
Plaintiff: Tetronics (International) Limited
Defendant: BlueOak Arkansas LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00530
Filed: May 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9:9
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 JUDGMENT: Consistent with #20 Order entered on this day, default judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff Tetronics (International) Limited. The final arbitral award issued on 4/17/2020 by the International Court of Arbitration of the International Chamber of Commerce in arbitration case number 23366/MK is confirmed pursuant to the Federal Arbitration Act, 9 U.S.C. 207. In accordance with the final arbitral award, judgment is granted in favor of Plaintiff Tetronics (International) Limited as set forth herein. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/28/2020. (ljb)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #16 Plaintiff's motion for a default judgment. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/28/2020. (ljb)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying #12 Defendant's motion to set aside the Clerk's entry of default, for staying this confirmation proceeding pending resolution of the French appeal, or for refusing confirmation of the arbitration award. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/14/2020. (ljb)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION for Default Judgment against BlueOak Arkansas LLC filed by BlueOak Arkansas LLC. (Buller, Joseph)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Set Aside Default MOTION to Stay and Alternative Motion to Refuse Recognition of Arbitral Award PLAINTIFF'S SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BLUEOAK ARKANSAS, LLCS MOTION (1) TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT, AND (2) TO STAY THIS SUIT PENDING THE OUTCOME OF THE ANNULMENT PROCEEDINGS, OR, ALTERNATIVELY, (3) TO REFUSE RECOGNITION OF THE ARBITRAL AWARD filed by Tetronics (International) Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Doan, Darby)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Default Judgment against BlueOak Arkansas LLC by Tetronics (International) Limited (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Judgment, #2 Exhibit B Riddell Declaration)(Doan, Darby)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Set Aside Default MOTION to Stay and Alternative Motion to Refuse Recognition of Arbitral Award filed by BlueOak Arkansas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Buller, Joseph)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Set Aside Default MOTION to Stay and Alternative Motion to Refuse Recognition of Arbitral Award filed by Tetronics (International) Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Doan, Darby)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #12 Motion to Set Aside Default, Motion to Stay and Alternative Motion to Refuse Recognition of Arbitral Award filed by BlueOak Arkansas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Buller, Joseph)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Set Aside Default (), MOTION to Stay and Alternative Motion to Refuse Recognition of Arbitral Award by BlueOak Arkansas LLC (Buller, Joseph)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to BlueOak Arkansas LLC. (ljb)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Entry of Default PLAINTIFF TETRONICS' MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST BLUEOAK ARKANSAS, LLC by Tetronics (International) Limited (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration of Cole A. Riddell)(Doan, Darby)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Cole A. Riddell on behalf of Tetronics (International) Limited (Riddell, Cole)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF TETRONICS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO CONFIRM ARBITRAL AWARD AGAINST BLUEOAK ARKANSAS, LLC against BlueOak Arkansas LLC, filed by Tetronics (International) Limited (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Document B, #3 Exhibit C)(Doan, Darby)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiff is directed to file the amended pleading within five days from this text entry. Upon filing of the amended complaint, the original summons will be deemed amended as requested by Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 06/30/2020. (jjb)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND FOR ORDER AMENDING SUMMONS by Tetronics (International) Limited (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint)(Doan, Darby)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tetronics (International) Limited. BlueOak Arkansas LLC served on 5/22/2020. (Doan, Darby)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Tetronics (International) Limited (Doan, Darby)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #2 Motion for Judgment PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONFIRM AN ARBITRATION AWARD filed by Tetronics (International) Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Doan, Darby)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Judgment PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONFIRM AN ARBITRATION AWARD by Tetronics (International) Limited (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Doan, Darby)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT TO CONFIRM ARBITRAL AWARD against BlueOak Arkansas LLC filed by Tetronics (International) Limited. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT077307.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tetronics (International) Limited v. BlueOak Arkansas LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tetronics (International) Limited
Represented By: Cole A. Riddell
Represented By: Darby Vincent Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BlueOak Arkansas LLC
Represented By: Joseph Richard Buller, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?