Highpoint Manufacturing LLC v. Alatus Aerosystems
Plaintiff: Highpoint Manufacturing LLC
Defendant: Alatus Aerosystems
Case Number: 4:2020cv00539
Filed: May 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #7 the Joint Motion to Dismiss. Accordingly, this CASE is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 05/22/20. (dmm)
May 22, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by Highpoint Manufacturing LLC. (Pickell, J.)
May 21, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #5 Stipulation of Dismissal and 6 Order. CORRECTION: The docket text for each entry was modified to indicate the document/entry was filed in error, at the request of the filing party and pursuant to instructions from Chambers. (thd)
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 DOCKET ENTRY MADE IN ERROR - DISREGARD. (dmm) (Docket text modified on 5/21/2020 pursuant to instructions from Chambers.) (thd).
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD. (Baker, John) (Docket text modified on 5/21/2020 at the request of the filing party.)(thd).
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 7/28/2020. Rule 26(f) Report due by 8/11/2020. Bench Trial set for 5/18/2021 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 5/20/20. (mmb)
May 19, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Alatus Aerosystems. (jbh)
May 19, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Alatus Aerosystems, filed by Highpoint Manufacturing LLC. (jbh)
May 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Alatus Aerosystems from White County Circuit Court, case number 73CV20-133. Fee of $400 paid; receipt number LIT077312. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Highpoint Manufacturing LLC v. Alatus Aerosystems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alatus Aerosystems
Represented By: John Keeling Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Highpoint Manufacturing LLC
Represented By: J. Slocum Pickell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?