Bray Sheet Metal Company et al v. International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers (SMART) Local Union No 36-L AFL-CIO
Plaintiff: Bray Sheet Metal Company, Edwards Metals Inc, HSI Inc, Ketcher & Company Inc and HSI Inc doing business as Harvey Sheet Metal Inc
Defendant: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers (SMART) Local Union No 36-L AFL-CIO
Case Number: 4:2020cv00695
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to Plaintiffs' June 19 Amended Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Pearson, Allison)
July 2, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #16 Response. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "BRIEF in Support re #15 Motion" as marked on the document. (jak)
July 1, 2020 Filing 16 BRIEF in Support re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to Plaintiffs' June 19 Amended Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Defendant's Brief if Support of its Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint)(Brooks, Brian) (Docket text modified on 7/2/2020 to correct the description of the document filed)(jak)
July 1, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to Plaintiffs' June 19 Amended Complaint by All Defendants (Brooks, Brian)
June 19, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Bray Sheet Metal Company, Edwards Metals Inc, HSI Inc, Ketcher & Company Inc. (Herrington, Daniel)
June 19, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers (SMART) Local Union No 36-L AFL-CIO, filed by Edwards Metals Inc, Bray Sheet Metal Company, Ketcher & Company Inc, HSI Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2017 Agreement)(Herrington, Daniel)
June 12, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers (SMART) Local Union No 36-L AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Ray Reasons)(Brooks, Brian)
June 12, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers (SMART) Local Union No 36-L AFL-CIO (Brooks, Brian)
June 11, 2020 Filing 10 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Bray Sheet Metal Company, Edwards Metals Inc, HSI Inc, Ketcher & Company Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit T)(Herrington, Daniel)
June 9, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by James I Singer filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers (SMART) Local Union No 36-L AFL-CIO. Fee $100 received. Receipt #LIT077621. (llg)
June 9, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Sally E. Barker filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers (SMART) Local Union No 36-L AFL-CIO. Fee $100 received. Receipt #LIT077620. (llg)
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian G. Brooks on behalf of International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers (SMART) Local Union No 36-L AFL-CIO (Brooks, Brian)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting in part #3 plaintiffs' motion to the limited extent that plaintiffs request that the Court shorten the time for Defendant International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers Local Union No. 36-L, AFL-CIO (SMART) to respond to the pending motion. The Court directs SMART respond to the pending motion on or before Friday, 06/12/2020, if it chooses to do so. The Court holds under advisement plaintiffs' request for a preliminary injunction and will consider that request ripe after 06/12/2020, absent good cause shown. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 06/05/2020. (ajt)
June 4, 2020 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Bray Sheet Metal Company, Edwards Metals Inc, HSI Inc, Ketcher & Company Inc. (Herrington, Daniel)
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Bray Sheet Metal Company, Edwards Metals Inc, HSI Inc, Ketcher & Company Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit E, #3 Exhibit F, #4 Exhibit G, #5 Exhibit H, #6 Exhibit I, #7 Exhibit J, #8 Exhibit K, #9 Exhibit L, #10 Document M, #11 Exhibit N, #12 Exhibit O, #13 Exhibit P, #14 Exhibit Q, #15 Exhibit R, #16 Exhibit S)(Herrington, Daniel)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Bray Sheet Metal Company, Edwards Metals Inc, HSI Inc, Ketcher & Company Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2015 Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - May 5, 2017 Meeting Minutes, #3 Exhibit C - June 6, 2017 Meeting Minutes)(Herrington, Daniel)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edwards Metals Inc, Bray Sheet Metal Company, Ketcher & Company Inc, HSI Inc. International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers (SMART) Local Union No 36-L AFL-CIO served on 6/2/2020. (Herrington, Daniel)
May 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers (SMART) Local Union No 36-L AFL-CIO filed by Edwards Metals Inc, Bray Sheet Metal Company, Ketcher & Company Inc, HSI Inc. (Fee $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT077423.) Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bray Sheet Metal Company et al v. International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers (SMART) Local Union No 36-L AFL-CIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bray Sheet Metal Company
Represented By: Allison Christine Pearson
Represented By: Daniel Lee Herrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwards Metals Inc
Represented By: Allison Christine Pearson
Represented By: Daniel Lee Herrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HSI Inc
Represented By: Allison Christine Pearson
Represented By: Daniel Lee Herrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ketcher & Company Inc
Represented By: Allison Christine Pearson
Represented By: Daniel Lee Herrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HSI Inc doing business as Harvey Sheet Metal Inc
Represented By: Allison Christine Pearson
Represented By: Daniel Lee Herrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers (SMART) Local Union No 36-L AFL-CIO
Represented By: Sally E. Barker
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Represented By: James I. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?