Srite v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Srite
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2020cv00741
Filed: June 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Patricia S Harris
Referring Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 08/10/2020. (ajt)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elizabeth Srite. Social Security Administration served on 8/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Return of Service)(Olinsky, Howard)
June 17, 2020 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (ljb)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of the Court shall issue summons to plaintiff, and plaintiff shall serve the appropriate parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 6/17/2020. (ljb)
June 15, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration filed by Elizabeth Srite. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)
June 15, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Elizabeth Srite. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Srite v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Srite
Represented By: Howard David Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?