Johnson v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Timothy J Johnson
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2020cv00743
Filed: June 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Timothy J Johnson. Social Security Administration served on 6/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit USPS Green Card, #2 Affidavit USPS Green Card, #3 Affidavit USPS Green Card)(McKinnon, Laura)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff may proceed without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. The Clerk is directed to issue summons to counsel for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/16/2020. (rph)
June 16, 2020 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and forwarded to Plaintiff's counsel for service. (jbh)
June 15, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration filed by Timothy J Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)
June 15, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Timothy J Johnson. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy J Johnson
Represented By: Laura J. McKinnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?