Coleman v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Lee Master Coleman, Jr
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2020cv00760
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Referring Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lee Master Coleman, Jr. Social Security Administration served on 6/30/2019. (Long, Martin)
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Beth Deere. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 07/07/2020. (ajt)
June 19, 2020 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and forwarded to Plaintiff's counsel for service. (jbh)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; and directing Mr. Coleman's counsel to prepare a summons, to be issued by the Clerk of Court, and to serve the complaint upon the Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 06/19/2020. (ajt)
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by Lee Master Coleman, Jr. (ljb)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lee Master Coleman, Jr. (ljb)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration filed by Lee Master Coleman, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lee Master Coleman, Jr. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Master Coleman, Jr
Represented By: Martin W. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?