Lindley v. Alyzen Medical Physics Inc et al
Plaintiff: Charles D Lindley
Defendant: Mark Deweese and Alyzen Medical Physics Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv00795
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Charles D Lindley (Attachments: #1 Document First Amended Complaint)(Bequette, George)
August 14, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #7 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Charles D Lindley.(Bequette, George)
August 14, 2020 Filing 12 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #11 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Charles D Lindley. (Bequette, George)
August 14, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Charles D Lindley. (Bequette, George)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 motion for extension of time for plaintiff to respond to defendants' motion to dismiss and counterclaim against plaintiff. Mr. Lindley may respond to the defendants' #4 motion to dismiss and the defendants' counterclaim on or before 8/14/2020. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/31/2020. (jbh)
July 28, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #7 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Charles D Lindley (Bequette, George)
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #5 Brief in Support. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error (wrong image file). The correct document was added to docket entry #5 based on the attached correspondence. (jak)
July 20, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the counterclaim filers as Alyzen Medical Physics, Inc. and Mark Deweese against Charles D. Lindley as marked on the document and pursuant to instruction from the filing attorney. (jak)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Charles D. Lindley filed by Mark Deweese and Alyzen Medical Physics Inc.(Block, Alexander) (Docket text modified on 7/20/2020 to correct the counterclaim party filers) (jak)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Perry Lee Wilson on behalf of Alyzen Medical Physics Inc, Mark Deweese (Wilson, Perry)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Alyzen Medical Physics Inc, Mark Deweese. (Haley, Willie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/20/2020: #1 Main Document - Correct (submitted 7/20/2020)) (jak).
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Alyzen Medical Physics Inc, Mark Deweese (Haley, Willie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Willie S. Haley on behalf of Alyzen Medical Physics Inc, Mark Deweese (Haley, Willie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Cale Block on behalf of Alyzen Medical Physics Inc, Mark Deweese (Block, Alexander)
June 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Charles D Lindley. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT077871.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindley v. Alyzen Medical Physics Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Deweese
Represented By: Alexander Cale Block
Represented By: Willie S. Haley
Represented By: Perry Lee Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alyzen Medical Physics Inc
Represented By: Alexander Cale Block
Represented By: Willie S. Haley
Represented By: Perry Lee Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles D Lindley
Represented By: George Jay Bequette, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?