Covington v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Deborah Covington
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2020cv00807
Filed: July 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/10/2020. (jbh)
July 10, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #4 Reply. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the document was filed in error. (cmn)
July 9, 2020 Filing 4 DOCKET ENTRY FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD. (Baltz, Randolph) (Docket entry modified on 7/10/2020 to indicate the document was filed in error pursuant to instruction from Chambers.)(cmn)
July 7, 2020 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and forwarded to Plaintiff's counsel for service. (ajt)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff may proceed without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. The Clerk is directed to issue summons to counsel for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/7/2020. (rph)
July 6, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Deborah Covington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)
July 6, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Deborah Covington. (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Covington v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Covington
Represented By: Randolph M. Baltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?