Deweese v. Munyan et al
Plaintiff: Kim Deweese
Defendant: Monte Munyan and John Does
Case Number: 4:2020cv00818
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Monte Munyan. (Pearson, Allison)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 07/27/2020. (pgt)
July 24, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO PARTIALLY DISMISS COMPLAINT by Monte Munyan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pearson, Allison)
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Christine Pearson on behalf of Monte Munyan (Pearson, Allison)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kim Deweese. (Sutter, Luther)
July 9, 2020 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 Motion to Dismiss filed by Monte Munyan. (ajt)
July 9, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Partially Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Monte Munyan. (ajt)
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Monte Munyan.(ajt)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Kim Deweese.(ajt)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Monte Munyan from Faulkner County Circuit Court, case number 23CV-20-518. Fee $400 paid, receipt number LIT078008. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deweese v. Munyan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monte Munyan
Represented By: Jamie Marie Huffman Jones
Represented By: Allison Christine Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Deweese
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?