JEK Services Inc et al v. Simmons Bank et al
Plaintiff: JFK Services Inc, James E Kusturin, Jr. and JEK Services Inc
Defendant: First State Bank, Centennial Bank, First Security Bank, Bank OZK, Does ABC Banks, 1-100, Arvest Bank, Simmons Bank and First Western Bank
Case Number: 4:2020cv00836
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:631
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to First Western Bank by JEK Services Inc. (Cearley, Robert)
September 9, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew King on behalf of First Western Bank (King, Andrew)
August 31, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss Party First State Bank by JEK Services Inc (Cearley, Robert)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motions, Doc. #27 & #28 , granted. Mr. Scott T. Sakiyama and Ms. Valerie L. Hletko are admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/27/2020. (slb)
August 26, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Valeria L. Hletko. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3786211. Filed by Arvest Bank (McHaney, James)
August 26, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Scott T. Sakiyama. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3786194. Filed by Arvest Bank (McHaney, James)
August 24, 2020 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Simmons Bank by JEK Services Inc. (Cearley, Robert)
August 18, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Post Fair on behalf of Bank OZK (Fair, Jacob)
August 18, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen R. Lancaster on behalf of Bank OZK (Lancaster, Stephen)
August 18, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Edwin L. Lowther, Jr on behalf of Bank OZK (Lowther, Edwin)
August 18, 2020 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Bank OZK by JEK Services Inc. (Cearley, Robert)
August 18, 2020 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to First State Bank by JEK Services Inc. (Cearley, Robert)
August 14, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by William A. Waddell, Jr on behalf of First Security Bank (Waddell, William)
August 11, 2020 Filing 19 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #18 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. (jak)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT directing the Clerk's Office to issue a Notice of Reassignment. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/11/2020. (jbh)
August 10, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to First Security Bank by JEK Services Inc. (Cearley, Robert)
August 10, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Centennial Bank by JEK Services Inc. (Cearley, Robert)
August 7, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Clayborne S. Stone on behalf of Centennial Bank (Stone, Clayborne)
August 6, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Streett on behalf of First State Bank (Streett, James)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 , #12 motions for admission pro hac vice of attorneys Ashley M. Simonsen and Andrew Soukup. Ms. Simonsen and Mr. Soukup shall appear as counsel for defendants in this matter. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/6/2020. (jbh)
August 5, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Andrew Soukup. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3766696. Filed by Simmons Bank (Crass, Kevin)
August 5, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Ashley M. Simonsen. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3766684. Filed by Simmons Bank (Crass, Kevin)
August 5, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin A. Crass on behalf of Simmons Bank (Crass, Kevin)
July 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. McHaney, Jr on behalf of Arvest Bank (McHaney, James)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 , #5 , #6 , #7 motions for admission pro hac vice of attorneys Damion M. Clifford, Gerhardt A. Gosnell, II, James E. Arnold, and Tiffany L. Carwile. Mr. Clifford, Mr. Gosnell, Mr. Arnold, and Ms. Carwile shall appear as counsel for plaintiffs in this matter. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/30/2020. (jbh)
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Tiffany L. Carwile. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3760997. Filed by JEK Services Inc (Cearley, Robert)
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by James E. Arnold. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3760987. Filed by JEK Services Inc (Cearley, Robert)
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Gerhardt A. Gosnell II. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3760977. Filed by JEK Services Inc (Cearley, Robert)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Damion M. Clifford. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3760937. Filed by JEK Services Inc (Cearley, Robert)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Arvest Bank by JEK Services Inc. (Cearley, Robert)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #1 Class Action Complaint, lacks an original signature (F.R.Cv.P.11(a) and Local Rule 5.5(c)(1)). (thd)
July 15, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Class Action Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the party filers as James E. Kusturin Jr. and JEK Services Inc. (jak)
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by James E Kusturin, Jr, JEK Services Inc. No summons issued. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT078081.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)(Docket text modified on 7/15/2020 to correct the party filers)(jak) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2020: #2 Main Document - Correct, #3 Civil Cover Sheet - Correct) (cmn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JEK Services Inc et al v. Simmons Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First State Bank
Represented By: James A. Streett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centennial Bank
Represented By: Clayborne S. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Security Bank
Represented By: William A. Waddell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank OZK
Represented By: Jacob Post Fair
Represented By: Edwin L. Lowther, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen R. Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does ABC Banks, 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arvest Bank
Represented By: James M. McHaney, Jr.
Represented By: Valerie L. Hletko
Represented By: Scott T. Sakiyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simmons Bank
Represented By: Ashley Margaret Simonsen
Represented By: Andrew Soukup
Represented By: Kevin A. Crass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Western Bank
Represented By: Andrew King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JFK Services Inc
Represented By: Tiffany L. Carwile
Represented By: James E. Arnold
Represented By: Gerhardt A. Gosnell, II
Represented By: Damien M. Clifford
Represented By: Robert M. Cearley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E Kusturin, Jr.
Represented By: Tiffany L. Carwile
Represented By: James E. Arnold
Represented By: Gerhardt A. Gosnell, II
Represented By: Damien M. Clifford
Represented By: Robert M. Cearley, Jr.
Represented By: Damion M. Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEK Services Inc
Represented By: Tiffany L. Carwile
Represented By: James E. Arnold
Represented By: Gerhardt A. Gosnell, II
Represented By: Robert M. Cearley, Jr.
Represented By: Damion M. Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?