Pitts v. Payne et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin Pitts
Defendant: James Gibson, Christopher Johnson, Dexter L Payne and Dexter McDonnell
Case Number: 4:2020cv00849
Filed: July 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: If Defendants intend to pursue a defense that Plaintiff failed to exhaust his administrative remedies before filing this lawsuit, it must be raised by motion for summary judgment no later than October 19, 2020. Discovery is stayed until the exhaustion issue is decided. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/17/2020. (csf)
September 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE, CONSENT AND REFERENCE to a Magistrate Judge forwarded by the Clerk of Court. (csf)
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed. James Gibson served on 8/12/2020. (ajt)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Christopher Johnson served on 8/12/2020. (ajt)
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Dexter McDonnell served on 8/12/2020. (ajt)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Dexter L Payne served on 8/12/2020. (ajt)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Thomas James on behalf of James Gibson, Christopher Johnson, Dexter McDonnell, Dexter L Payne (James, Robert)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by James Gibson, Christopher Johnson, Dexter McDonnell, Dexter L Payne.(James, Robert)
July 29, 2020 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (jbh)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summonses for the Defendants; and directing the Marshal to serve Defendants with summonses and copies of the #2 complaint, with any attachments, without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/29/2020. (jbh)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS granting #1 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; and directing the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of this Order to the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, the ADC Compliance Division, and the Warden of the Varner Unit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/29/2020. (jbh)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Benjamin Pitts.(kdr)
July 20, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Benjamin Pitts. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pitts v. Payne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gibson
Represented By: Robert Thomas James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Johnson
Represented By: Robert Thomas James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter L Payne
Represented By: Robert Thomas James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter McDonnell
Represented By: Robert Thomas James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?