PerfectVision Manufacturing Inc v. EpuVision SA
Plaintiff: PerfectVision Manufacturing Inc
Defendant: EpuVision SA
Case Number: 4:2020cv00884
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting as modified #2 Motion. PerfectVision must either confirm with chambers that it has final versions of the Letters or provide the Clerk of the Court with final versions of its Letters to be issued. The Court also grants PerfectVision a four-month extension to serve process by 3/4/2021. And the Court grants PerfectVision's request to extend the period for EpuVision to respond to the petition within 45 days after service. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/25/2020. (jak)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance Ex-Parte Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory and to Extend The Time for Service by PerfectVision Manufacturing Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - part 1, #2 Exhibit A - part 2, #3 Exhibit A - part 3, #4 Exhibit A - part 4)(Gershner, Stephen)
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD against EpuVision SA filed by PerfectVision Manufacturing Inc. (Fee $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT078338.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PerfectVision Manufacturing Inc v. EpuVision SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PerfectVision Manufacturing Inc
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EpuVision SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?