Glover v. Design Group Inc et al
Plaintiff: Dawnyetta Glover
Defendant: Myron Jackson, Design Group Inc and Design Group Marketing LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00927
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Responsive Pleading Deadline. Defendants' response to amended complaint is due 12/9/2020. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 9/17/2020. (hml)
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time Unopposed Motion for Extension of Responsive Pleading Deadline by Design Group Marketing LLC, Myron Jackson (Jones, Daveante)
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daveante Jones on behalf of Design Group Marketing LLC, Myron Jackson (Jones, Daveante)
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED and SUBSTITUTED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Dawnyetta Glover. Summons issued for Design Group Marketing LLC and returned to counsel for service. (llg)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Myron Jackson.(Jones, Daveante)
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dawnyetta Glover. Myron Jackson served on 8/19/2020. (Sanford, Joshua)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Dawnyetta Glover. (Fee $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT078474.) Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glover v. Design Group Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myron Jackson
Represented By: Daveante Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Design Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Design Group Marketing LLC
Represented By: Daveante Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawnyetta Glover
Represented By: Stacy Gibson
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?