Gale et al v. Wright Medical Technology Inc
Plaintiff: Sharon Boone and Steven M Gale
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv00949
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Wright Medical Technology Inc (Ash, Dana)
September 18, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana J. Ash on behalf of Wright Medical Technology Inc (Ash, Dana)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER UPON TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/9/2020. (jbh)
August 18, 2020 Filing 23 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTIFICATION to Counsel from the Clerk of Court regarding MDL 2949, In Re Profemur Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation. The case of Gale, et al v. Wright Medical Technology Inc, originally filed in the U.S. District Court for the District of Minnesota and assigned case number 0:20-cv-01009, was transferred by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation to the Eastern District of Arkansas and assigned to U.S. District Judge Kristine G. Baker as case number 4:20-cv-00949-KGB for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. The master case for this litigation is 4:20-md-2949-KGB. All counsel should request E-File Registration with the Eastern District of Arkansas through PACER. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/18/2020. (thd)
August 18, 2020 Filing 22 Case electronically transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:20-cv-01009. Copy of transfer order, case file, and docket sheet received.
August 18, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to the Eastern District of Arkansas per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Kristine G. Baker.(kt) [Transferred from mnd on 8/18/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE by Wright Medical Technology, Inc. re #18 Order on Stipulation, of Motion to Transfer by JPML (Moran, William) [Transferred from mnd on 8/18/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney N. Kirkland Pope for Sharon Boone and for Steven M. Gale. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/28/2020. (NAH) [Transferred from mnd on 8/18/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER on #15 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML Ruling on Motion to Transfer. This matter is STAYED, pending transfer and consolidation by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. The Rule 16 scheduling conference, set for August 13, 2020, is CANCELLED, as to Plaintiffs Steven M. Gale and Sharon Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/28/2020. (JMK) [Transferred from mnd on 8/18/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Neal Kirkland Pope. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7917536 filed by Sharon Boone, Steven M. Gale. (Raso, Ashleigh) [Transferred from mnd on 8/18/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #15 Stipulation. (Moran, William) [Transferred from mnd on 8/18/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING JPML RULING ON MOTION TO TRANSFER by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Moran, William) [Transferred from mnd on 8/18/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael J. Blakely, II for Sharon Boone and for Steven M. Gale. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/24/2020. (NAH) [Transferred from mnd on 8/18/2020.]
July 23, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael J. Blakely, Jr.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7907665 filed by Sharon Boone, Steven M. Gale. (Raso, Ashleigh) [Transferred from mnd on 8/18/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/6/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 8/13/2020 at 03:30 PM by Conference Bridge (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)Associated Cases: 0:20-cv-01009-NEB-HB, 0:20-cv-01290-NEB-HB, 0:20-cv-01310-NEB-HB(JMK) [Transferred from mnd on 8/18/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 11 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Neal Kirkland Pope. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7878767 filed by Sharon Boone, Steven M. Gale. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing)(Raso, Ashleigh) Modified text on 7/22/2020 (NAH). [Transferred from mnd on 8/18/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 10 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK) [Transferred from mnd on 8/18/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 9 (Text-Only) NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing: The Pretrial Conference set for 6/30/2020 before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung is hereby CANCELLED. (HAM) [Transferred from mnd on 8/18/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. Case reassigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel and Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer for all further proceedings. Judge Susan Richard Nelson, Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-1009 NEB/HB. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings.Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel and Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 6/2/2020 and Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 6/3/2020. (MMG) [Transferred from mnd on 8/18/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 6/30/2020 at 11:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(HAM) [Transferred from mnd on 8/18/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 6 Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint filed by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Moran, William) [Transferred from mnd on 8/18/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Sharon Boone, Steven M. Gale (Raso, Ashleigh) [Transferred from mnd on 8/18/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Michael J. Blakely, Jr. as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (lmb) [Transferred from mnd on 8/18/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (lmb) [Transferred from mnd on 8/18/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 20-cv-1009 (SRN/TNL). (lmb) [Transferred from mnd on 8/18/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-7673079) filed by Steven M. Gale, Sharon Boone. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Raso, Ashleigh) Modified text on 4/24/2020 (lmb). [Transferred from mnd on 8/18/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gale et al v. Wright Medical Technology Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Boone
Represented By: Ashleigh Raso
Represented By: N. Kirkland Pope
Represented By: Michael J. Blakely, II
Represented By: Michael J. Blakely, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven M Gale
Represented By: Ashleigh Raso
Represented By: N. Kirkland Pope
Represented By: Michael J. Blakely, II
Represented By: Michael J. Blakely, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology Inc
Represented By: William L. Moran
Represented By: Dana J. Ash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?