Pennington v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Lora Pennington
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2020cv00950
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Patricia S Harris
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/2/2020. (jbh)
September 2, 2020 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General and returned to counsel for service. (fjg)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 application to proceed in forma pauperis. The applicant may proceed without prepayment of fees and costs or the necessity of giving security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 8/25/2020. (ljb)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Lora Pennington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lora Pennington. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pennington v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lora Pennington
Represented By: Daniel Allen Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?