Matosich v. Wright Medical Group Inc et al
Plaintiff: Craig Matosich
Defendant: Does 1-10 and Wright Medical Technology Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv00960
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 109 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Wright Medical Technology Inc (Ash, Dana)
September 18, 2020 Filing 108 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana J. Ash on behalf of Wright Medical Technology Inc (Ash, Dana)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER UPON TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/9/2020. (jbh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 106 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTIFICATION to Counsel from the Clerk of Court regarding MDL 2949, In Re Profemur Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation. The case of Matosich v. Wright Medical Group Inc et al, originally filed in the U.S. District Court for the USDC Montana and assigned case number 9:19-cv-00016, was transferred by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation to the Eastern District of Arkansas and assigned to U.S. District Judge Kristine G. Baker as case number 4:20-cv-00960-KGB for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. The master case for this litigation is 4:20-md-2949-KGB. All counsel should request E-File Registration with the Eastern District of Arkansas through PACER. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/19/2020. (jbh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 105 Case electronically transferred in from U.S. District Court, District of Montana; Case Number 9:19-cv-00016. Copy of transfer order, case file, and docket sheet received.
August 18, 2020 Filing 104 Transfer Order (MDL) from Eastern District of Arkansas requesting transfer of action. Entire case file sent to requesting District. (ASG) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER STAYING CASE. All pending motions are DENIED, subject to renewal. The jury trial set for 8/10/2020 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 6/17/2020. (dle) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 102 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #101 MOTION in Limine filed by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A) (Twidwell, Kevin) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 101 MOTION in Limine Kevin A. Twidwell appearing for Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Twidwell, Kevin) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 100 Sealed Document Unredacted Exhibit A re: #99 Response to Motion filed by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Twidwell, Kevin) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 99 RESPONSE to Motion re #82 MOTION in Limine filed by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A- Under Seal, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Ex. D) (Twidwell, Kevin) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER denying #93 Motion to Exceed Word Limit. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 6/10/2020. (ASG) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 97 NOTICE by Wright Medical Technology, Inc. re #93 MOTION to Exceed Word Limit (Twidwell, Kevin) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 96 RESPONSE to Motion re #90 MOTION to Continue TRIAL DATE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING RULING FROM MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION PANEL filed by Craig Matosich. (Towe, Kimberly) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 95 REPLY to Response to Motion re #72 MOTION to Strike filed by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Twidwell, Kevin) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 94 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #93 MOTION to Exceed Word Limit filed by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Twidwell, Kevin) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 93 MOTION to Exceed Word Limit Kevin A. Twidwell appearing for Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Twidwell, Kevin) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 92 RESPONSE to Motion re #72 MOTION to Strike filed by Craig Matosich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1- P's Expert Rebuttal Report, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2- Drewry Deposition) (Towe, Kimberly) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 91 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #90 MOTION to Continue TRIAL DATE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING RULING FROM MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION PANEL filed by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3) (Twidwell, Kevin) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 90 MOTION to Continue TRIAL DATE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING RULING FROM MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION PANEL Kevin A. Twidwell appearing for Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Twidwell, Kevin) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 89 Sealed Document Unredacted Exhibit 8 UNDER SEAL re: #83 Brief/Memorandum in Support, filed by Craig Matosich. (Towe, James) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 88 Sealed Document Unredacted Exhibit 7 UNDER SEAL re: #83 Brief/Memorandum in Support, filed by Craig Matosich. (Towe, James) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 87 Sealed Document Unredacted Exhibit 6 UNDER SEAL re: #83 Brief/Memorandum in Support, filed by Craig Matosich. (Towe, James) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 86 Sealed Document Unredacted Exhibit 4 UNDER SEAL re: #83 Brief/Memorandum in Support, filed by Craig Matosich. (Towe, James) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 85 Sealed Document Unredacted Exhibit 2 UNDER SEAL re: #83 Brief/Memorandum in Support, filed by Craig Matosich. (Towe, James) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 84 Sealed Document Unredacted Exhibit 1 UNDER SEAL re: #83 Brief/Memorandum in Support, filed by Craig Matosich. (Towe, James) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 83 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #82 MOTION in Limine filed by Craig Matosich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 UNDER SEAL, #2 Exhibit 2 UNDER SEAL, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4 UNDER SEAL, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6 UNDER SEAL, #7 Exhibit 7 UNDER SEAL, #8 Exhibit 8 UNDER SEAL) (Towe, James) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 82 MOTION in Limine James T. Towe appearing for Plaintiff Craig Matosich (Towe, James) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #78 Motion. The Defendant shall produce the remaining relevant materials on or before June 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 5/28/2020. (ASG) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 80 ERRATA #78 MOTION Supplemental Relief . (Twidwell, Kevin) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 79 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #78 MOTION Supplemental Relief filed by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Twidwell, Kevin) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 78 MOTION Supplemental Relief Kevin A. Twidwell appearing for Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Twidwell, Kevin) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 77 REPLY to Response to Motion re #54 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Twidwell, Kevin) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 76 REPLY to Response to Motion re #58 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Troy Drewry filed by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Drewry Deposition Excerpt) (Twidwell, Kevin) Modified on 5/22/2020 to correct document description; NEF regenerated (TAG). [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 75 Sealed Document Unredacted Exhibit 2 re: #74 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Craig Matosich. (Towe, Kimberly) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 74 REPLY to Response to Motion re #51 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Craig Matosich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Matosich Deposition) (Towe, Kimberly) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 73 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #72 MOTION to Strike filed by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rebuttal Disclosure, #2 Exhibit Deposition Excerpts of Troy Drewry) (Twidwell, Kevin) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 72 MOTION to Strike Kevin A. Twidwell appearing for Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Twidwell, Kevin) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Filing 71 Notice of Correction: re #69 Statement of Disputed Facts. The filing error relates to: Incorrect Docket Event used. See the attached document for a brief description of the error made. (ASG) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 70 RESPONSE to Motion re #54 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Craig Matosich. (Towe, Kimberly) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 69 Statement of Disputed Facts re: #56 Statement of Undisputed Fact, #57 Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Matosich Depo, #2 Affidavit of Matosich, #3 Drewry Report, #4 BMI Calculator, #5 Willstein Deposition, #6 Drewry Rebuttal Report, #7 Affidavit of Drewry, #8 News Release 8-14-2006, #9 News Release 2-9-2007, #10 UNDER SEAL, #11 UNDER SEAL) (Towe, Kimberly) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 68 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION Kimberly L. Towe by Craig Matosich. (Towe, James) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 67 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Craig Matosich by Craig Matosich. (Towe, James) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 66 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Troy Drewry by Craig Matosich. (Towe, James) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 65 RESPONSE to Motion re #58 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Troy Drewry filed by Craig Matosich. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Troy D. Drewry, #2 Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosure and Report, #3 Plaintiff's Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosure and Report, #4 Bono Report, #5 James Report, #6 Ochoa Report) (Towe, James) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 64 STATUS REPORT by Craig Matosich. (Viscomi, Michael) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly L. Towe on behalf of Craig Matosich (Towe, Kimberly) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #41 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 5/7/2020. (ASG) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 61 Statement of Disputed Facts re: #60 Response to Motion filed by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Medical Record, #2 Exhibit Bone Scan Result, #3 Exhibit Dr. Willstein TC 1.06.15, #4 Exhibit Dir Willstein TC 1.08.15, #5 Exhibit Willstein Dep. Excerpt, #6 Exhibit MES Re Socket Loose, #7 Exhibit J. Ochoa Report Excerpt, #8 Exhibit B. James Report Excerpt) (Twidwell, Kevin) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 60 RESPONSE to Motion re #51 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Twidwell, Kevin) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 59 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #58 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Troy Drewry filed by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Excerpt of T. Drewry Report, #2 Exhibit T. Drewry C.V., #3 Exhibit Excerpt from Drewry Rebuttal Report) (Twidwell, Kevin) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 58 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Troy Drewry Kevin A. Twidwell appearing for Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Twidwell, Kevin) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Filing 57 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #54 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Twidwell, Kevin) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Filing 56 Statement of Undisputed Fact re: #54 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Excerpt- Plaintiff Depo, #2 Exhibit Excerpt- Willstein Dep, #3 Exhibit Excerpt- Medical Record, #4 Exhibit Consent, #5 Exhibit Excerpt- James Report, #6 Exhibit Excerpt- Ochoa Report, #7 Exhibit Excerpt- Drewry Report, #8 Exhibit Excerpt- Drewry Rebuttal, #9 Exhibit Excerpt- Bono Report) (Twidwell, Kevin) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Filing 55 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION Declaration of Deborah Daurer in Support of Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FDA Clearance, #2 Exhibit IFU, #3 Exhibit Safety Alert) (Twidwell, Kevin) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION for Summary Judgment Kevin A. Twidwell appearing for Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Twidwell, Kevin) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
April 16, 2020 Filing 53 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #51 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Craig Matosich. (Towe, James) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
April 16, 2020 Filing 52 Statement of Undisputed Fact re: #51 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Craig Matosich filed by Craig Matosich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10) (Towe, James) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
April 16, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment James T. Towe appearing for Plaintiff Craig Matosich (Towe, James) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Order Setting: IT IS ORDERED that the motion #49 is GRANTED. The (fully briefed) motions deadline is VACATED and RESET for May 14, 2020. The Scheduling Order of April 30, 2019 #28 remains in full force and effect in all other respects. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 4/1/2020. (ASG) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
April 1, 2020 Filing 49 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions Kevin A. Twidwell appearing for Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Amend Scheduling Order) (Twidwell, Kevin) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying #47 Stipulated Motion. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 3/31/2020. (dle) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
March 31, 2020 Filing 47 Stipulated Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Kevin A. Twidwell appearing for Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Amend Scheduling Order) (Twidwell, Kevin) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 46 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION Regarding Attorneys Fees and Costs by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Van Dyke, David) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 45 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Attorney Fees and Cost by Craig Matosich. (Towe, James) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Filing 44 REPLY to Response to Motion re #41 MOTION to Compel , #42 MOTION to Compel Brief in Support filed by Craig Matosich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13) (Towe, James) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 43 RESPONSE to Motion re #41 MOTION to Compel filed by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Costa) (Twidwell, Kevin) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Filing 42 Brief in Support of Motion #41 James T. Towe appearing for Plaintiff Craig Matosich (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4) (Towe, James) Modified on 2/13/2020 to rename. (ASG). [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION to Compel James T. Towe appearing for Plaintiff Craig Matosich (Towe, James) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; adopting Findings and Recommendations #34 in full. Plaintiff Craig Motosich's claims against Wright Medical Group are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 8/27/2019. (ASG) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief U.S. District Judge Dana L. Christensen for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 8/9/2019. (APP) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto recused. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 8/8/2019. (APP) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 37 Electronic Mailing of Consent Judge DeSoto as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Kevin A. Twidwell, Michael Fawaz, David C. Van Dyke, Tiffany L. Carpenter, James T. Towe. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 8/23/2019. (APP) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 8/5/2019. (APP) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER - Consent to the jurisdiction of the United States Magistrate Judge having been withheld or met with objection, this case remains assigned to Hon. Dana L. Christensen; re #8 Mailing of Consent Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 7/26/2019. (CDH) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 34 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Wright Medical Group, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 7/17/2019. (TCL) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 33 SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Craig Matosich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Towe, James) (Docket text added.) (NOS) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 5/16/2019. (TCL) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #29 Motion for Protective Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 5/16/2019. (TCL) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 30 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Twidwell, Kevin) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Protective Order Kevin A. Twidwell appearing for Defendants Does 1-10, Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Stipulated Protection Order) (Twidwell, Kevin) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/30/2020 at 02:30 PM in Missoula, MT before Judge Dana L. Christensen. Jury Trial set for 8/10/2020 at 09:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Judge Dana L. Christensen. Amended Pleadings due by 10/7/2019. Discovery due by 3/31/2020. Motions due by 4/30/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 4/30/2019. (TCL) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 27 MINUTE ENTRYMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/30/2019. (TCL) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE by Craig Matosich re #18 Response to Motion, (Towe, James) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Wright Medical Group, Inc.. (Twidwell, Kevin) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 24 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Van Dyke, David) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 23 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Craig Matosich. (Towe, James) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 22 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Craig Matosich. (Towe, James) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 21 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Craig Matosich. (Towe, James) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 5/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 4/17/2019. (TCL) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION Tiffany L. Carpenter to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2294526.) Kevin A. Twidwell appearing for Defendants Does 1-10, Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Tiffany Carpenter, #2 Certification Under MT Rule, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Twidwell, Kevin) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Craig Matosich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Business Wire, #2 Exhibit WMG Schedule, #3 Exhibit 2006 Press Release, #4 Exhibit 2008 Press Release, #5 Exhibit 2007 Press Release, #6 Exhibit WSJ Article) (Towe, James) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 17 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Wright Medical Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Twidwell, Kevin) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Kevin A. Twidwell appearing for Defendant Wright Medical Group, Inc. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Twidwell, Kevin) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Twidwell, Kevin) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Twidwell, Kevin) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Does 1-10, Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Twidwell, Kevin) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Does 1-10, Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Twidwell, Kevin) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 4/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 3/18/2019. (TCL) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2278125.) Kevin A. Twidwell appearing for Defendants Does 1-10, Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of David C. Van Dyke, #2 Certification for Admission for DVD, #3 Proposed Order) (Twidwell, Kevin) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 3/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 3/13/2019. (TCL) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 Electronic Mailing of Consent: Judge Lynch as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Kevin A. Twidwell, James T. Towe. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 3/28/2019. (APP) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2275852.) Kevin A. Twidwell appearing for Defendants Does 1-10, Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate, #3 Proposed Order) (Twidwell, Kevin) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin A. Twidwell on behalf of All Defendants (Twidwell, Kevin) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 4/23/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 4/23/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 4/23/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 4/30/2019 at 11:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 1/29/2019. (TXB) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Craig Matosich. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. waiver sent on 1/25/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (Towe, James) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Craig Matosich. Wright Medical Group, Inc. waiver sent on 1/25/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (Towe, James) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to Wright Medical Group, Inc. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. Original mailed to counsel. (ASG) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
January 23, 2019 Filing fee: $400.00 paid, receipt number 0977-2252865. (ASG) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Craig Matosich. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet) (ASG) [Transferred from mtd on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matosich v. Wright Medical Group Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Represented By: David C. Van Dyke
Represented By: Kevin A. Twidwell
Represented By: Michael O. Fawaz
Represented By: Tiffany Leigh Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology Inc
Represented By: David C. Van Dyke
Represented By: Kevin A. Twidwell
Represented By: Michael O. Fawaz
Represented By: Tiffany Leigh Carpenter
Represented By: Dana J. Ash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Matosich
Represented By: Kimberly L. Towe
Represented By: James T. Towe
Represented By: Jamie T. Towe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?