Larsen v. Wright Medical Technology Inc
Plaintiff: Steven J Larsen
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv00961
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Central Division Office
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER UPON TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/9/2020. (jbh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 26 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTIFICATION to Counsel from the Clerk of Court regarding MDL 2949, In Re Profemur Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation. The case of Larsen v. Wright Medical Technology Inc, originally filed in the U.S. District Court for the USDC Wisconsin Western and assigned case number 3:20-cv-00261, was transferred by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation to the Eastern District of Arkansas and assigned to U.S. District Judge Kristine G. Baker as case number 4:20-cv-00961-KGB for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. The master case for this litigation is 4:20-md-2949-KGB. All counsel should request E-File Registration with the Eastern District of Arkansas through PACER. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/19/2020. (jbh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 25 Case electronically transferred in from U.S. District Court, District of Wisconsin Western; Case Number 3:20-cv-00261. Copy of transfer order, case file, and docket sheet received.
August 18, 2020 Filing 24 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order. Case closed. Signed by Karen K. Caldwell, Chair of the Panel on 8/7/2020 (voc) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 23 Status Report Regarding Transfer to MDL by Plaintiff Steven J. Larsen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - JPML doc.134 Transfer Order) (Moccio, Vincent) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance of George E. McLaughlin filed by George E. McLaughlin for Plaintiff Steven J. Larsen. (McLaughlin, George) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to Amended Complaint ; Affirmative Defenses; and Jury Demand by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Fawaz, Michael) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson attached. Dispositive Motions due 6/7/2021. Settlement Letters due 9/24/2021. Motions in Limine due 10/1/2021. Response to Motion due 10/15/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/27/2021 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 11/8/2021 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/24/2020. (rks) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 6/23/2020 [:10] (cak) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wright Medical Technology, Inc., filed by Steven J. Larsen. (Moccio, Vincent) Modified on 6/18/2020: Spoke with counsel. The caption is incorrect. Defendant is Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The parties have submitted what they call a stipulated motion to dismiss certain claims in plaintiff Steven Larson's complaint and to dismiss as moot defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.'s motion to dismiss. Dkt. #17 . But a stipulation under Rule 41(a) can be used only to dismiss the entire action; the appropriate vehicle to dismiss individual claims is an amended pleading under Rule 15(a). See Taylor v. Brown, 787 F. 3d 851, 857-58 (7th Cir. 2015). So I will construe the stipulation as a motion to amend Larson's complaint with Wright's written consent under Rule 15(a)(2), which is GRANTED. Wright's motion to dismiss, Dkt. #15 , is DISMISSED as moot. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 6/9/2020. (voc) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 17 Joint Stipulation to As to Claims and Pending Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Van Dyke, David) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 6/23/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (voc) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 16 Brief in Support of #15 Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Fawaz, Michael) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. Brief in Opposition due 6/8/2020. Brief in Reply due 6/18/2020. (Fawaz, Michael) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Defendant's proposed--and unopposed--stipulated protective order #12 is accepted and entered as the court's order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/6/2020. (voc) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 13 Brief in Support of #12 Motion for Protective Order by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Protective Order) (Carpenter, Tiffany) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 12 Motion for Protective Order by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Carpenter, Tiffany) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 11 Amended Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Van Dyke, David) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #9 Motion to Admit Tiffany Leigh Carpenter Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 4/21/2020. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 9 Motion to Admit Tiffany Leigh Carpenter Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2664377.) by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Carpenter, Tiffany) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #7 Motion to Admit Michael Owen Fawaz Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 4/20/2020. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 Motion to Admit Michael Owen Fawaz Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2664268.) by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Fawaz, Michael) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Filing 6 Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Plaintiff Steven Larson. (Moccio, Vincent) Modified on 4/7/2020. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Van Dyke, David) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by David C. Van Dyke for Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Van Dyke, David) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. waiver sent on 3/24/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Moccio, Vincent) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (voc) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (voc) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of Steven J. Larson against Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2648590.), filed by Steven Larson. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons) (Moccio, Vincent) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larsen v. Wright Medical Technology Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven J Larsen
Represented By: George E. McLaughlin
Represented By: Vincent J. Moccio
Represented By: Vincent Joseph Moccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology Inc
Represented By: Tiffany Leigh Carpenter
Represented By: David C. Van Dyke
Represented By: Michael O. Fawaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?