Barlau et al v. Wright Medical Technology Inc
Plaintiff: Russell Barabe and Carrie Barlau
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv00975
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Wright Medical Technology Inc (Burke, Sean)
September 17, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean K. Burke on behalf of Wright Medical Technology Inc (Burke, Sean)
September 14, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon O'Reilly on behalf of Wright Medical Technology Inc (O'Reilly, Sharon)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER UPON TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/9/2020. (ljb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 12 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTIFICATION to Counsel from the Clerk of Court regarding MDL 2949, In Re Profemur Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation. The case of Barlau et al v. Wright Medical Technology Inc, originally filed in the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California and assigned case number 3:20-cv-01112, was transferred by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation to the Eastern District of Arkansas and assigned to U.S. District Judge Kristine G. Baker as case number 4:20-cv-00975-KGB for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. The master case for this litigation is 4:20-md-2949-KGB. All counsel should request E-File Registration with the Eastern District of Arkansas through PACER. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/19/2020. (cmn)
August 19, 2020 Filing 11 Case electronically transferred in from District of California Southern, case number 3:20-cv-01112. Copy of transfer order, case file, and docket sheet received.
August 18, 2020 Filing 10 Case transferred to District of Eastern District of Arkansas. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Eastern District of Arkansas*.*500 W. Capitol Ave.**Little Rock, AR 72201* (Attachments: #1 MDL 2949 CTO-1) (jdt) [Transferred from casd on 8/19/2020.]
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on #7 Motion to Stay pending ruling on motion to transfer by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 7/23/2020. (sjt) [Transferred from casd on 8/19/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. In light of the parties pending request to transfer this action to the Eastern District of Arkansas, the Court hereby VACATES the Early Neutral Evaluation (ENE) and Case Management Conference ("CMC") set for 8/26/20 at 2:00 p.m. This Order concerns the ENE and CMC ONLY. The parties motion to stay all proceedings remains pending before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Miller. The ENE and CMC will be reset for a future date if necessary. (no document attached) (src) [Transferred from casd on 8/19/2020.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Stay All Proceedings and Continue the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference Pending a ruling on the Motion to Transfer all cases involving the Profemur Modular Hips Implant Stem to the Eastern District of Arkansas, Civil Docket: MDL No. 2949 by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-18)(Renner, John)(QC mailer sent re: missing signature certification) (sjt). [Transferred from casd on 8/19/2020.]
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 8/26/2020 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2020 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Joint Discovery Plan due 8/19/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 7/10/2020.(sjt) [Transferred from casd on 8/19/2020.]
July 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Wright Medical Technology, Inc. re #4 Answer to Complaint . Identifying Corporate Parent Wright Medical Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Wright Medical Group N.V. for Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Renner, John)(sjt)(dsn) [Transferred from casd on 8/19/2020.]
July 8, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Wright Medical Technology, Inc..(Renner, John)Attorney John Robert Renner added to party Wright Medical Technology, Inc.(pty:dft) (sjt). [Transferred from casd on 8/19/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carrie Barlau, Russell Barabe. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. served. (Yuhl, Christopher) (jmo). [Transferred from casd on 8/19/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jmr) (jms). [Transferred from casd on 8/19/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Wright Medical Technology, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14031038.), filed by Carrie Barlau, Russell Barabe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1112-JM-KSC. Judge Jeffrey T. Miller and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Yuhl, Christopher)(jmr) (jms). [Transferred from casd on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barlau et al v. Wright Medical Technology Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology Inc
Represented By: John Robert Renner
Represented By: Sharon O'Reilly
Represented By: Sean K. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Barabe
Represented By: Christopher Paul Yuhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Barlau
Represented By: Christopher Paul Yuhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?