Bliss v. Wright Medical Technology Inc et al
Plaintiff: Susan Bliss
Defendant: Microport Orthopedics Inc and Wright Medical Technology Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv00976
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Gold on behalf of Susan Bliss (Gold, Danielle)
September 29, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Relkin on behalf of Susan Bliss (Relkin, Ellen)
September 18, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Wright Medical Technology Inc (Ash, Dana)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER UPON TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/9/2020. (ljb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 36 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTIFICATION to Counsel from the Clerk of Court regarding MDL 2949, In Re Profemur Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation. The case of Bliss v. Wright Medical Technology Inc et al, originally filed in the U.S. District Court for the Central District of California and assigned case number 2:18-cv-07197, was transferred by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation to the Eastern District of Arkansas and assigned to U.S. District Judge Kristine G. Baker as case number 4:20-cv-00976-KGB for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. The master case for this litigation is 4:20-md-2949-KGB. All counsel should request E-File Registration with the Eastern District of Arkansas through PACER. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/19/2020. (cmn)
August 19, 2020 Filing 35 Case electronically transferred in from District of California Central, case number 2:18-cv-07197. Copy of transfer order, case file, and docket sheet received.
August 18, 2020 Filing 34 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER - 1 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2949, transferring case to USDC, Eastern District of Arkansas and assigned to Honorable Kristine G. Baker. Case transferred electronically on 8/18/2020. (mrgo) [Transferred from cacd on 8/19/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 33 RESPONSE filed by Defendant MicroPort Orthopedics, Inc.to Notice (Other) #30 of Case Status and Request to Restore to Active Calendar (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - JPML DKT 136 - Conditional Transfer Order)(Gruner, Anne) [Transferred from cacd on 8/19/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE OF CASE STATUS AND REQUEST TO RESTORE TO ACTIVE CALENDAR filed by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Ash, Dana) [Transferred from cacd on 8/19/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 31 SCHEDULING NOTICE re: Notice of Case Status and Request to Restore to Active Calendar filed by Plaintiff #30 - The matter is set for a Telephone Conference on 8/24/2020 at 1:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from cacd on 8/19/2020.]
August 4, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE Notice of Case Status and Request to Restore to Active Calendar filed by Plaintiff Susan Bliss. (Nokes, Melinda) [Transferred from cacd on 8/19/2020.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 29 MINUTES OF NEW CASE STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Status conference held. The Court stays the case for six months. The matter is moved to the inactive calendar. Should the case not resolve, the parties are ordered to notify the Court, in writing, when the case should be restored to the active calendar. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (lom) [Transferred from cacd on 8/19/2020.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 28 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Angela Hebberd counsel for Defendants MicroPort Orthopedics, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. ANGELA HEBBERD is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Wright Medical Technology, Inc. and MicroPort Orthopedics Inc.. (Hebberd, Angela) [Transferred from cacd on 8/19/2020.]
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #26 Non-Resident Attorney Dana J. Ash APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendants Wright Medical Technology, Inc., MicroPort Orthopedics, Inc., designating J. Robert Renner as local counsel. (mrgo) [Transferred from cacd on 8/19/2020.]
November 15, 2018 Filing 26 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Dana J. Ash to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants MicroPort Orthopedics, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22748789) filed by Defendants MicroPort Orthopedics, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Renner, John) [Transferred from cacd on 8/19/2020.]
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 12/10/2018 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) [Transferred from cacd on 8/19/2020.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 24 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc., identifying Wright Medical Technology, Inc., Wright Medical Group, Inc., and Wright Medical Group, N.V.. (Renner, John) [Transferred from cacd on 8/19/2020.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #3 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc..(Renner, John) [Transferred from cacd on 8/19/2020.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 22 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant MicroPort Orthopedics, Inc., identifying MicroPort Orthopedics, Inc., MicroPort Orthopedics Holdings, Inc., MicroPort Scientific Cooperatief, U.A.and MicroPort Orthopedics Corporation. (Renner, John) [Transferred from cacd on 8/19/2020.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #3 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant MicroPort Orthopedics, Inc..(Renner, John) [Transferred from cacd on 8/19/2020.]
October 18, 2018 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Susan Bliss. upon MicroPort Orthopedics, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/21/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. Waiver of Service signed by Dana J. Ash, Duane Morris, LLP. (Nokes, Melinda) [Transferred from cacd on 8/19/2020.]
October 18, 2018 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Susan Bliss. upon Wright Medical Technology, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/21/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. Waiver of Service signed by Dana J. Ash, Duane Morris, LLP. (Nokes, Melinda) [Transferred from cacd on 8/19/2020.]
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #11 #15 #16 Non-Resident Attorney Anne A Gruner APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Wright Medical Technology, Inc, MicroPort Orthopedics, Inc., designating John Robert Renner as local counsel. (lom) [Transferred from cacd on 8/19/2020.]
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #12 Non-Resident Attorney Scott J. Kramer APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Wright Medical Technology, Inc., MicroPort Orthopedics, Inc., designating John Robert Renner as local counsel. (lom) Modified on 10/17/2018 (lom). [Transferred from cacd on 8/19/2020.]
October 16, 2018 Filing 16 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Anne A. Gruner to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants MicroPort Orthopedics, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 10/11/2018, Receipt No. 26CQQF6U) filed by Defendants MicroPort Orthopedics, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Renner, John) [Transferred from cacd on 8/19/2020.]
October 16, 2018 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Anne A. Gruner to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants MicroPort Orthopedics, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 10/11/2018, Receipt No. 26CQQF6U) filed by Defendants MicroPort Orthopedics, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Renner, John) [Transferred from cacd on 8/19/2020.]
October 16, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Scott J. Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants MicroPort Orthopedics, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22571662) #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Certificates of Good Standing have been required since 9/08. See LR 83-2.1.3.3. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). Case number is incomplete. (lt) [Transferred from cacd on 8/19/2020.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Anne A. Gruner to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants MicroPort Orthopedics, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22564018) #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. (lom) [Transferred from cacd on 8/19/2020.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Scott J. Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants MicroPort Orthopedics, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22571662) filed by Defendants MicroPort Orthopedics, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Renner, John) [Transferred from cacd on 8/19/2020.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Anne A. Gruner to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants MicroPort Orthopedics, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22564018) filed by Defendants MicroPort Orthopedics, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney John Robert Renner added to party MicroPort Orthopedics, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney John Robert Renner added to party Wright Medical Technology, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Renner, John) [Transferred from cacd on 8/19/2020.]
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) [Transferred from cacd on 8/19/2020.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #3 as to defendant MicroPort Orthopedics, Inc. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 8/19/2020.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #3 as to defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 8/19/2020.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 8/19/2020.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 8/19/2020.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #1 filed by Plaintiff Susan Bliss. (Nokes, Melinda) [Transferred from cacd on 8/19/2020.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #1 filed by Plaintiff Susan Bliss. (Nokes, Melinda) [Transferred from cacd on 8/19/2020.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 08/16/2018, receipt number 26BLIA24), filed by Plaintiff Susan Bliss.(Nokes, Melinda) [Transferred from cacd on 8/19/2020.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Susan Bliss, (Attorney Melinda Davis Nokes added to party Susan Bliss(pty:pla))(Nokes, Melinda) [Transferred from cacd on 8/19/2020.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Susan Bliss. (Nokes, Melinda) [Transferred from cacd on 8/19/2020.]
August 16, 2018 FILING FEE PAID for new civil case. Receipt No. 0973-22268995 for $400 filing fee. (Nokes, Melinda) [Transferred from cacd on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bliss v. Wright Medical Technology Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microport Orthopedics Inc
Represented By: John Robert Renner
Represented By: J. Scott Kramer
Represented By: Dana J. Ash
Represented By: Anne A. Gruner
Represented By: Angela Hebberd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology Inc
Represented By: John Robert Renner
Represented By: J. Scott Kramer
Represented By: Dana J. Ash
Represented By: Anne A. Gruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Bliss
Represented By: Melinda Davis Nokes
Represented By: Danielle Gold
Represented By: Ellen Relkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?