Burdolski v. Wright Medical Technology Inc
Plaintiff: Thomas R Burdolski
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv00980
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER UPON TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/9/2020. (jbh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 12 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTIFICATION to Counsel from the Clerk of Court regarding MDL 2949, In Re Profemur Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation. The case of Burdolski v. Wright Medical Technology Inc, originally filed in the U.S. District Court of Kansas and assigned case number 2:20-cv-02116, was transferred by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation to the Eastern District of Arkansas and assigned to U.S. District Judge Kristine G. Baker as case number 4:20-cv-00980-KGB for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. The master case for this litigation is 4:20-md-2949-KGB. All counsel should request E-File Registration with the Eastern District of Arkansas through PACER. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/19/2020. (cmn)
August 19, 2020 Filing 11 Case electronically transferred in from District of Kansas, case number 2:20-cv-02116. Copy of transfer order, case file, and docket sheet received.
August 19, 2020 Filing 10 TRANSFER ORDER. Case electronically transferred to Eastern District of Arkansas (MDL 2949). ***Terminating Case. (hw) [Transferred from ksd on 8/19/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Joint Request to Enter Stipulation to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling on Motion to Transfer by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. All proceedings are stayed pending the outcome of Plaintiff's counsel's Motion to Transfer. The scheduling conference set for 7/17/2020 is cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 6/4/2020. (rel) [Transferred from ksd on 8/19/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Stay Case Joint Request to Enter Stipulation to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling on Motion to Transfer by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Sayler, Scott) [Transferred from ksd on 8/19/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 7/17/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 7/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 6/2/2020. (ala) [Transferred from ksd on 8/19/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc's ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Wright Medical Technology, Inc..(Sayler, Scott) [Transferred from ksd on 8/19/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wright Medical Technology, Inc., filed by Thomas R. Burdolski.(Franciskato, Brian) [Transferred from ksd on 8/19/2020.]
April 6, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. waiver sent on 3/30/2020, answer due on 5/29/2020. (smc) (Note: This is a re-filing of docket entry 3 which was filed using the incorrect ECF event; document re-filed for administrative purposes only.) Modified text 4/10/20. (kao) [Transferred from ksd on 8/19/2020.]
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 ***Please disregard entry - filed using incorrect event. See #4 for correct filing.*** WAIVER of Service of Summons by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Sayler, Scott) Modified on 4/9/2020 (smc). [Transferred from ksd on 8/19/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Thomas R Burdolski - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Franciskato, Brian) [Transferred from ksd on 8/19/2020.]
March 12, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (gw) [Transferred from ksd on 8/19/2020.]
March 12, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (gw) [Transferred from ksd on 8/19/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5088341.), filed by Thomas R Burdolski. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Franciskato, Brian) [Transferred from ksd on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burdolski v. Wright Medical Technology Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology Inc
Represented By: Scott W. Sayler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas R Burdolski
Represented By: Brian S. Franciskato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?