Williams v. Wright Medical Technology Inc
Plaintiff: Pamela Sue Williams
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv00981
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Wright Medical Technology Inc (Ash, Dana)
September 18, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana J. Ash on behalf of Wright Medical Technology Inc (Ash, Dana)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER UPON TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/9/2020. (jbh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 11 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTIFICATION to Counsel from the Clerk of Court regarding MDL 2949, In Re Profemur Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation. The case of Williams v. Wright Medical Technology Inc, originally filed in the U.S. District Court of Maryland and assigned case number 1:20-cv-00578, was transferred by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation to the Eastern District of Arkansas and assigned to U.S. District Judge Kristine G. Baker as case number 4:20-cv-00981-KGB for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. The master case for this litigation is 4:20-md-2949-KGB. All counsel should request E-File Registration with the Eastern District of Arkansas through PACER. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/19/2020. (cmn)
August 19, 2020 Filing 10 Case electronically transferred in from District of Maryland, case number 1:20-cv-00578. Copy of transfer order, case file, and docket sheet received.
August 18, 2020 Filing 9 MDL Certified Transfer ORDER. Signed by Karen K. Caldwell, Chair of the Panel of Multidistrict Litigation on 8/14/2020. (krs, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Debra J Humphrey. Directing attorney Debra J Humphrey to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 4/10/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 9, 2020 Filing 7 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Debra J. Humphrey by Pamela Sue Williams (Attachments: #1 Attachment). The fee has already been paid.(Darby, Perry) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 6 Local Rule 103.5a CERTIFICATION OF FILING OF STATE COURT PAPERS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Dunham, Jordan) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Wright Medical Technology, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Wright Medical Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Wright Medical Group, N.V for Wright Medical Technology, Inc..(Dunham, Jordan) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Wright Medical Technology, Inc..(Dunham, Jordan) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Filing 3 Deficiency Notice -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 3/11/2020 (ds3, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Catherine C. Blake. (ko, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
March 3, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR GARRETT COUNTY. (ds3, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Wright Medical Technology, Inc., filed by Pamela Sue Williams. (Attachments: #1 SC Civil Case Report, #2 SC Docket Sheet)(ds3, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Garrett County, case number C-11-CV-20-000019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8548114), filed by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Complaint, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Dunham, Jordan) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Wright Medical Technology Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Sue Williams
Represented By: Perry Matthew Darby
Represented By: Debra J. Humphrey
Represented By: Hans David Leibensperger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology Inc
Represented By: Robert Brooke Hopkins
Represented By: Jordan F. E. Dunham
Represented By: Robert Hopkins
Represented By: Dana J. Ash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?