Headington v. Wright Medical Technology Inc
Plaintiff: Darin Headington
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv01097
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #13 Notification to Counsel. CORRECTION: The Order Upon Transfer was omitted from the entry, due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The document was added as an attachment to docket entry #13 and is attached hereto for service on the parties. (thd)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTIFICATION to Counsel from the Clerk of Court regarding MDL 2949, In Re Profemur Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation. The case of Headington v. Wright Medical Technology Inc, originally filed in the U.S. District Court for the USDC Iowa Northern and assigned case number 6:20-cv-02056, was transferred by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation to the Eastern District of Arkansas and assigned to U.S. District Judge Kristine G. Baker as case number 4:20-cv-01097-KGB for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. The master case for this litigation is 4:20-md-2949-KGB. Attached is a copy of Order Upon Transfer signed by Judge Baker. Electronic Notification signed at the Direction of the Court on 9/14/2020. (jbh) (Document added as an attachment on 9/14/2020.) (thd).
September 14, 2020 Filing 12 Case electronically transferred in from U.S. District Court, District of Iowa Northern; Case Number 6:20-cv-02056. Copy of transfer order, case file, and docket sheet received.
September 14, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3) MDL No. 2949. This action is transferred to USDC Eastern District of Arkansas and assigned to the Honorable Kristine G Baker. Signed by John W Nichols, Clerk of the Panel, on 9/14/2020. (Case electronically transferred to Eastern District of Arkansas) (des) [Transferred from iand on 9/14/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Wright Medical Technology, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Wright Medical Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Wright Medical Group N.V. for Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Lederer, Gregory) [Transferred from iand on 9/14/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER and jury demand to #1 Complaint by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.(Lederer, Gregory) Modified text on 9/1/2020 (des) [Transferred from iand on 9/14/2020.]
August 19, 2020 FEE Receipt: $ 100.00, receipt number IAN110027645 for Pro Hac Vice Fee for David Van Dyke by Wright Medical Technology, Inc (ksy) [Transferred from iand on 9/14/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 *TEXT ORDER granting #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David C. Van Dyke on behalf of Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificates of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted. Pro Hac Vice filing fee due by 8/31/2020. Registration with the Northern District of Iowa through PACER due by 8/31/2020. Signed by Clerk on 8/17/2020 (no conflicts found). (skm) [Transferred from iand on 9/14/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David C. Van Dyke by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc (Attachments: #1 COGS California, #2 COGS Illinois) (Lederer, Gregory) [Transferred from iand on 9/14/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory M Lederer on behalf of Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Lederer, Gregory) [Transferred from iand on 9/14/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darin Headington. Wright Medical Technology, Inc served on 8/11/2020, answer due 9/1/2020. (Pope, N) [Transferred from iand on 9/14/2020.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney N. Kirkland Pope on behalf of Plaintiff Darin Headington. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 8/06/2020. (des) [Transferred from iand on 9/14/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney N. Kirkland Pope ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3261111) by Plaintiff Darin Headington (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Pope, N) [Transferred from iand on 9/14/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Wright Medical Technology, Inc. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Actions new case packet) (des) [Transferred from iand on 9/14/2020.]
July 31, 2020 DOCKET Annotation: Case opened in the WRONG DIVISION by Attorney Max E Kirk as case number 1:20-cv-00075. Clerk hereby notifies attorney and Financial Department the corrected case number is now 6:20-cv-02056. (des) [Transferred from iand on 9/14/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AIANDC-3258398.), filed by Darin Headington. Scheduling Report due by 10/29/2020 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kirk, Max) [Transferred from iand on 9/14/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Headington v. Wright Medical Technology Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darin Headington
Represented By: Max E. Kirk
Represented By: N. Kirkland Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology Inc
Represented By: David C. Van Dyke
Represented By: Gregory M. Lederer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?