Ashley v. Hodges et al
Plaintiff: Patricia A Ashley
Defendant: Steve Lee, Scotty Hodges, Evelyn Reed, Bill Donnor, Brent Houston, Josh Briggs and Robin Freeman
Case Number: 4:2020cv01125
Filed: September 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE filed by Patricia A Ashley. (fjg)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of #9 Motion Not to Dismiss filed by Patricia A Ashley. (fjg)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE by Patricia A Ashley re #11 #12 (jap)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Return Receipt by Patricia A Ashley. (fjg)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Josh Briggs. (Keller, Thomas)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Josh Briggs (Keller, Thomas)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #9 Motion Not to Dismiss filed by Patricia A Ashley. (jap)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION Not to Dismiss by Patricia A Ashley (jap)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of filing U. S. Postal Service Receipt by Patricia A Ashley. (jap)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 12/28/2020; Rule 26(f) Report due by 1/12/2021; Bench Trial set for sometime during the week of 8/2/2021 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #4D before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 10/26/2020. (tmw)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Bill Donnor, Robin Freeman, Scotty Hodges, Brent Houston, Steve Lee, Evelyn Reed. (Richmond, Lanny)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Bill Donnor, Robin Freeman, Scotty Hodges, Brent Houston, Steve Lee, Evelyn Reed (Richmond, Lanny)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Lanny Dwight Richmond, II on behalf of Bill Donnor, Robin Freeman, Scotty Hodges, Brent Houston, Steve Lee, Evelyn Reed (Richmond, Lanny)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patricia A Ashley. All Defendants. (fjg)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of filing U. S. Postal Service Receipts by Patricia A Ashley (jap)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to All Defendants and returned to party for service. (fjg)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Patricia A Ashley. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT078976.) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashley v. Hodges et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Lee
Represented By: Lanny Dwight Richmond, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scotty Hodges
Represented By: Lanny Dwight Richmond, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evelyn Reed
Represented By: Lanny Dwight Richmond, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Donnor
Represented By: Lanny Dwight Richmond, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Houston
Represented By: Lanny Dwight Richmond, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Briggs
Represented By: Thomas Christoph Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Freeman
Represented By: Lanny Dwight Richmond, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia A Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?