Rasulallah et al v. Smith & Nephew Inc
Plaintiff: Barbara Rasulallah
Defendant: John Does and Smith & Nephew Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv01143
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Rasulallah's complaint is dismissed without prejudice and (as requested) with leave to amend. Amended complaint due by 12/1/2020. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/3/2020. (jak)
October 30, 2020 Filing 10 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #9 Response to Motion filed by Barbara Rasulallah. (Proctor, Willard)
October 30, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Barbara Rasulallah. (Proctor, Willard)
October 29, 2020 Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 12/17/2020. Jury Trial set for 8/8/2022 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 1A before Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 10/29/2020. (slb)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, Doc. #6 , granted. Response due by 30 October 2020. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/16/2020. (slb)
October 15, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #5 Memorandum by Barbara Rasulallah (Proctor, Willard)
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Smith & Nephew Inc. (Lubozynski, Matthew)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Smith & Nephew Inc (Lubozynski, Matthew)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Smith & Nephew Inc (Lubozynski, Matthew)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Barbara Rasulallah.(bmd)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Smith & Nephew Inc from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60-CV-20-2875. Fee $400 received. Receipt number LIT079028. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rasulallah et al v. Smith & Nephew Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew Inc
Represented By: Glen G. Reid, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Edgar Craddock, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew Mahoney Lubozynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Rasulallah
Represented By: Willard Proctor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?