Big Rock Development LLC v. Papen et al
Plaintiff: Big Rock Development LLC
Defendant: Ecologic Modulars LLC, Monster Tiny LLC, Omega Supply Group Inc, Monster Mod Inc, All Abode Inc, Bad Donkey Development LLC, Omega Twin River Holdings II LLC, Ecoevolution Assets LLC, OMG 4Real Properties Inc, First Community Bank, Brand Built System Inc, OMG Investments Group Inc, OMG World Holdings Inc, Modern Mod Inc, Omega Twin River Holdings LLC, Steampunk Trailer and Metalworks Inc, Omega Builders Group Inc and Brand Built Systems Inc
3Rd Party Plaintiff: David K Papen, Omega Mod Group Inc and Ecologic Synergies International Inc
3Rd Party Defendant: Resortments LLC, Russell R Huckaby and Silvertown LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv01149
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Central Division Office
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 19 LETTER to the Clerk for the Circuit Court of Independence County transmitting a copy of the case file and certified copies of #18 Order to Remand and the docket sheet via certified mail. (jak)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: The Court doesn't have subject matter jurisdiction to hear this case on removal. This case is remanded to the Circuit Court of Independence County, Arkansas. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/13/2020. (jak)
October 5, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #14 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the Third Party Complaint is filed against Resortments LLC, Silvertown LLC, and Russell R Huckaby and that the Counterclaim is filed against Big Rock Development LLC. (thd)
October 2, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Calhoun, Joseph)
October 2, 2020 Filing 16 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #9 Order, filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Calhoun, Joseph)
October 2, 2020 Filing 15 BRIEF filed by Big Rock Development LLC, Russell R Huckaby, Resortments LLC, Silvertown LLC re #9 Order, (Overton, J.)
October 2, 2020 Filing 14 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Resortments LLC, Silvertown LLC, and Russell R Huckaby, COUNTERCLAIM against Big Rock Development LLC by Ecologic Synergies International Inc, Omega Mod Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Calhoun, Joseph) (Docket text modified on 10/5/2020 to correct the names of the Third Party Defendants and the Counter Defendant.) (thd).
October 2, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Calhoun, Joseph)
October 2, 2020 Filing 12 Defendants' ANSWER to #2 Complaint, by All Abode Inc, Bad Donkey Development LLC, Brand Built Systems Inc, Ecoevolution Assets LLC, Ecologic Modulars LLC, Russell R Huckaby, Modern Mod Inc, Monster Mod Inc, Monster Tiny LLC, OMG 4Real Properties Inc, OMG Investments Group Inc, OMG World Holdings Inc, Omega Builders Group Inc, Omega Supply Group Inc, Omega Twin River Holdings II LLC, Omega Twin River Holdings LLC, Resortments LLC, Silvertown LLC, Steampunk Trailer and Metalworks Inc.(Calhoun, Joseph)
September 30, 2020 Filing 11 BRIEF filed by First Community Bank (Brissey, Laura)
September 29, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Notice of Removal. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the party filers to be David K Papen,Omega Mod Group Inc, Ecologic Synergies International Inc, Ecologic Modulars LLC, Monster Mod Inc, Bad Donkey Development LLC, OMG 4Real Properties Inc, Ecoevolution Assets LLC, Omega Supply Group Inc, Omega Builders Group Inc, OMG Investments Group Inc, OMG World Holdings Inc, OMG World Holdings Inc, Omega Twin River Holdings II LLC,Modern Mod Inc, Brand Built System Inc, Omega Twin River Holdings LLC, Monster Tiny LLC, and Steampunk Trailer and Metalworks Inc. (thd)
September 29, 2020 Filing 10 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #1 Notice of Removal lacks an original signature (F.R.Cv.P. 11(a) and Local Rule 5.5 (c)(1)). (thd)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Removed case, #1 , noted. The Court asks the parties to file simultaneous briefs on federal subject matter jurisdiction by 5:00 p.m. on 10/2/2020. Until the jurisdictional issue is sorted, the parties should abide by the terms of the Independence County Circuit Court's Order dated 9/10/2020. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/28/2020. (jak)
September 25, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED ANSWER to #2 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Big Rock Development LLC, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against Russell R Huckaby, Silvertown LLC, Resortments LLC by David K Papen. (ajt)
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 Motion to Dismiss, filed by All Abode Inc, Bad Donkey Development LLC, Brand Built System Inc, Ecoevolution Assets LLC, Ecologic Modulars LLC, Ecologic Synergies International Inc, Modern Mod Inc, Monster Mod Inc, Monster Tiny LLC, OMG 4Real Properties Inc, OMG Investments Group Inc, OMG World Holdings Inc, Omega Builders Group Inc, Omega Mod Group Inc, Omega Supply Group Inc, Omega Twin River Holdings II LLC, Omega Twin River Holdings LLC, David K Papen, Steampunk Trailer and Metalworks Inc. (ajt)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by All Abode Inc, Bad Donkey Development LLC, Brand Built System Inc, Ecoevolution Assets LLC, Ecologic Modulars LLC, Ecologic Synergies International Inc, Modern Mod Inc, Monster Mod Inc, Monster Tiny LLC, OMG 4Real Properties Inc, OMG Investments Group Inc, OMG World Holdings Inc, Omega Builders Group Inc, Omega Mod Group Inc, Omega Supply Group Inc, Omega Twin River Holdings II LLC, Omega Twin River Holdings LLC, David K Papen, Steampunk Trailer and Metalworks Inc.(ajt)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Included Brief by Big Rock Development LLC. (ajt)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Ecologic Synergies International Inc, David K Papen.(ajt)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by First Community Bank.(ajt)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 VERIFIED PETITION FOR EX PARTE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ACCOUNTING, APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER AND REPLEVIN, INCLUDED COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT, OPEN ACCOUNT, DETRIMENT AL RELIANCE, UNJUST ENRICHMENT, FRAUD, CONVERSION AND VIOLATIONS OF THE ARKANSAS DECEPTIVE TRADE PRACTICES ACT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Big Rock Development LLC.(ajt)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Independence County Circuit Court, case number 32CV-2020-142. Fee $400 paid, receipt number LIT079035. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Big Rock Development LLC v. Papen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ecologic Modulars LLC
Represented By: Joseph Davidson Calhoun, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monster Tiny LLC
Represented By: Joseph Davidson Calhoun, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omega Supply Group Inc
Represented By: Joseph Davidson Calhoun, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monster Mod Inc
Represented By: Joseph Davidson Calhoun, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Abode Inc
Represented By: Joseph Davidson Calhoun, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bad Donkey Development LLC
Represented By: Joseph Davidson Calhoun, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omega Twin River Holdings II LLC
Represented By: Joseph Davidson Calhoun, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ecoevolution Assets LLC
Represented By: Joseph Davidson Calhoun, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OMG 4Real Properties Inc
Represented By: Joseph Davidson Calhoun, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Community Bank
Represented By: Laura Wood Brissey
Represented By: Christine Lamkin
Represented By: Joseph Davidson Calhoun, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brand Built System Inc
Represented By: Joseph Davidson Calhoun, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OMG Investments Group Inc
Represented By: Joseph Davidson Calhoun, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OMG World Holdings Inc
Represented By: Joseph Davidson Calhoun, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Modern Mod Inc
Represented By: Joseph Davidson Calhoun, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omega Twin River Holdings LLC
Represented By: Joseph Davidson Calhoun, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steampunk Trailer and Metalworks Inc
Represented By: Joseph Davidson Calhoun, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omega Builders Group Inc
Represented By: Joseph Davidson Calhoun, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brand Built Systems Inc
Represented By: Joseph Davidson Calhoun, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Big Rock Development LLC
Represented By: J. Don Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: David K Papen
Represented By: Joseph Davidson Calhoun, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Omega Mod Group Inc
Represented By: Joseph Davidson Calhoun, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Ecologic Synergies International Inc
Represented By: Joseph Davidson Calhoun, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Resortments LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Russell R Huckaby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Silvertown LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?