Randle v. Little Rock Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Leodis Randle
Defendant: Jeff Thomas, Does Sex Offender Regulator; Supervisor, 12th Street Police Substation; S.O.R.A and Little Rock Police Department
Case Number: 4:2020cv01257
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: J Thomas Ray
Referring Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Filing 14 Supplement re #7 Notice of Appeal and #13 Amended Notice of Appeal, by Leodis Randle.(ajt)
November 12, 2020 Filing 13 Amended NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #3 Order and #4 Judgment by Leodis Randle. (ajt)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER of USCA as to #7 Notice of Appeal filed by Leodis Randle: The Clerk of the district court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER. (ajt)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER of USCA as to #7 Notice of Appeal filed by Leodis Randle: Appellant is directed to pay to the Clerk of the United States District Court the appellate docketing fee of $505, or to file a pleading in this court explaining why Appellant is eligible to proceed without pre-payment of the fee, within 30 days of the date of this order. (ajt)
November 10, 2020 Filing 10 USCA Docketing Letter as to #7 Notice of Appeal filed by Leodis Randle. USCA Case Number 20-3354. (ajt)
November 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA SUPPLEMENT as to #7 Notice of Appeal re #3 Order and #4 Judgment. (ajt)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #6 motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Plaintiff may file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal with the Eighth Circuit. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/09/2020. (ajt)
November 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #3 Order and #4 Judgment by Leodis Randle. (ajt)
November 9, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Leodis Randle. (ajt)
November 3, 2020 Filing 5 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (ljb)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 JUDGMENT: Consistent with #3 Order that was entered on this day, this case is hereby dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/3/2020. (ljb)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER dismissing without prejudice #1 Plaintiff's Complaint, pursuant to the three strikes rule in 28 U.S.C. 1915(g); and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. If Plaintiff wishes to continue this case, he must, within 30 days of the entry of this Order, submit the statutory filing fee of $400, in full, and file a motion to reopen the case. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/3/2020. (ljb)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER referring this case to United States Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray for further proceedings and recommendation. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/20/2020. (ljb)
October 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Leodis Randle. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Randle v. Little Rock Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leodis Randle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does Sex Offender Regulator; Supervisor, 12th Street Police Substation; S.O.R.A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Rock Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?